BNSF Railway Company v. High Country Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: High Country Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to the Thirteenth Judicial District Court, re: Remand (yc)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected MOTION to Remand to State Court by High Country Transportation, Inc.. (Rincon, Carlos)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Vacating Initial Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack granting #10 Motion to Remand to State Court (yc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by High Country Transportation, Inc.. (Rincon, Carlos)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by High Country Transportation, Inc. (Rincon, Carlos)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by High Country Transportation, Inc.. (Rincon, Carlos)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BNSF Railway Company. (DeBrine, Earl)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/15/2019. (kc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
February 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (kdh)
February 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6296572 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by High Country Transportation, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rincon, Carlos)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by High Country Transportation, Inc. from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2018-01496. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by High Country Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rincon, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. High Country Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Earl E. DeBrine, Jr.
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Country Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: Yosef W Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?