Haggerton v. Giving Home Health Care LLC

Plaintiff: April Haggerton
Defendant: Giving Home Health Care, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00169
Filed: February 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
1 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Transferring Case. The Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of New Mexico (ECF No. #9 ) is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico. The Scheduling Conference set for March 4, 2019 is hereby VACATED. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/28/2019. (angar, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to District of New Mexico. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00152-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Giving Home Health Care LLC.(Walker, Colin) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff April Haggerton. (Schreiber, Sarah) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to District of New Mexico by Defendant Giving Home Health Care LLC. (Walker, Colin) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Giving Home Health Care LLC may have an extension of time, up to and including 2/25/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Giving Home Health Care LLC. (Walker, Colin) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 2/25/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/30/19. (amont, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Haggerton. Giving Home Health Care LLC served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Woods, Shelby) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Claire E. Hunter by Claire E. Hunter on behalf of April HaggertonAttorney Claire E. Hunter added to party April Haggerton(pty:pla) (Hunter, Claire) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Giving Home Health Care LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6489384)Attorney Sarah Alice Schreiber added to party April Haggerton(pty:pla), filed by April Haggerton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schreiber, Sarah) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggerton v. Giving Home Health Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Haggerton
Represented By: Claire E. Hunter
Represented By: Sarah Alice Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giving Home Health Care, LLC.
Represented By: Colin Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?