Martinez v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Lina Martinez
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00170
Filed: March 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: James A Parker
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 5/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 5/2/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/19/2019. (mlt)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Allen, Meena)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 4, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
March 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Allen, Meena)
March 2, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6311195 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
March 2, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Allen, Meena)
March 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2019-00014. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Martinez
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?