State of New Mexico, et al v. United States et al

Plaintiff: New Mexico Environment Department and Hector Balderas
Defendant: United States and United States Department of Air Force
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
2 Judge: John K Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John K. Robbenhaar granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 60 days after Plaintiffs file an Amended Complaint. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States, United States Department of Air Force. (McDonough, Eileen)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John K. Robbenhaar as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg*)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Minard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Minard, Anne)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Minard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Minard, Anne) Modified on 4/2/2019 (jg).
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Mitchell on behalf of All Defendants (Mitchell, David)
March 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 5, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg)
March 5, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (jg)
March 5, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6314175 re #1 Complaint filed by State of NM, ex rel (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Khoury, Cholla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States, United States Department of Air Force ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State of NM, ex rel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khoury, Cholla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New Mexico, et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Environment Department
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Hower
Represented By: Christopher N. Atencio
Represented By: Anne Minard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Anne Minard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: David D. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Air Force
Represented By: David D. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?