Castillo v. Vista Living Communities

Plaintiff: Sara Aranda Castillo
Defendant: Vista Living Communities
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Vista Living Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Thomas, Krystle)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Setting Telephone Status Conference. Telephone Status Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTERING SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time pending briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2019. (kc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Vista Living Communities of Extension to File Reply Brief (Thomas, Krystle)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sara Aranda Castillo Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Bates Nos. AC1 to AC463 (Martinez, Orlando) Modified on 4/19/2019 to specify service(mnb).
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Vista Living Communities of Extension to file Response re Motion to Remand (Thomas, Krystle)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vista Living Communities re Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Thomas, Krystle)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Sara Aranda Castillo (Martinez, Orlando)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (tkl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sara Aranda Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Martinez, Orlando)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Vista Living Communities. (Thomas, Krystle)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/28/2019. (kc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vista Living Communities dba Vista Hermosa (Thomas, Krystle)
March 6, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6318581 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vista Living Communities dba Vista Hermosa (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomas, Krystle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vista Living Communities dba Vista Hermosa from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-00247. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Vista Living Communities dba Vista Hermosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Krystle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Vista Living Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Living Communities
Represented By: Krystle A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Aranda Castillo
Represented By: Orlando Coronado Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?