Balderas v. Dolgencorp LLC
Plaintiff: Hector Balderas
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00295
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned as the trial and pretrial judges. (ng)
April 1, 2019 Filing 118 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:17-cv-00832. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER transferring Balderas v. Dolgencorp, LLC, No. 17-00832-CV-W-GAF to the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico. Signed on 3/28/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 116 **Remark:** To correct a minor typographical error, the 3/21/2019 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motion to certify class (amended) has been replaced and notice regenerated to all parties. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Moore, Terri) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (163) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (173) motion to certify class in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (155) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (160) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (163) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (153) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (162) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (147) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (162) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (157) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (173) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (142) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (168) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (176) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (144) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (143) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (136) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (108) motion to certify class in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (74) motion to certify class in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting in part and denying in part (51) motion to certify class in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; Signed on 3/21/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF (Mitchell, Lisa). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 114 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (106 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 189 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 202 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 108 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 178 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 115 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 197 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 222 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 189 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 196 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 181 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 197 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 187 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 191 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 77 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 210 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 207 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 177 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 188 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 175 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 207 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 170 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 194 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF) MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Colin McClain, Ken McClain, Andrew Smith, Kevin Stanley, Steve Nolan, John Zuccarini, and Ademi & OReilly LLP filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (204 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 204 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 191 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 188 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 185 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 178 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 74 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 175 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 105 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 103 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 139 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 207 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 172 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 186 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 112 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 199 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 219 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 186 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 194 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 167 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 194 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 184 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 193 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF) MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Kanner & Whiteley, LLC and Professor Ciolino filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting (208) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (219) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (200) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (205) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (208) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (198) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (207) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (192) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (202) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (218) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (187) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (213) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (221) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (189) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (233) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (189) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (182) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (154) motion for extension of time in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (120) motion for extension of time in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF Signed on 1/18/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting (196) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (206) motion to seal document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (188) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (193) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (174) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (196) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (186) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (195) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (180) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (187) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (178) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (190) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (206) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (188) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (175) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (201) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (209) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (177) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (221) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (176) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (169) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (141) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (107) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (76) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (114) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (105) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 1/7/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting (193) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (203) motion to seal document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (185) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (190) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (171) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (193) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (183) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (192) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (177) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (184) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (175) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (187) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (203) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (185) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (172) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (198) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (206) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (174) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (218) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (173) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (166) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (138) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (104) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (73) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (111) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (102) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 1/7/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER directing the parties file their unredacted suggestions regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class (Doc. # 173) no later than January 10, 2019. Signed on 1/7/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 107 SUGGESTIONS in support re (197 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF) MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Colin McClain, Ken McClain, Andrew Smith, Kevin Stanley, Steve Nolan, John Zuccarini, and Ademi & OReilly LLP [Redacted Version] filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Colin McClain, Ken McClain, Andrew Smith, Kevin Stanley, Steve Nolan, John Zuccarini, and Ademi & OReilly LLP filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION to seal document Suggestions in Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Colin McClain, Ken McClain, Andrew Smith, Kevin Stanley, Steve Nolan, John Zuccarini, and Ademi & OReilly LLP filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 104 SUGGESTIONS in support re (204 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 204 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 191 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 188 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 185 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 178 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 74 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 175 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 105 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 103 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 139 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 207 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 172 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 186 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 112 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 199 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 219 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 186 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 194 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 167 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 194 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 184 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 193 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF) MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Kanner & Whiteley, LLC and Professor Ciolino [Redacted Version] filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION to compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Kanner & Whiteley, LLC and Professor Ciolino filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION to seal document Unredacted Suggestions and Exhibits in Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Third-Party Subpoenas to Kanner & Whiteley, LLC and Professor Ciolino filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 101 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Gary A. Fenner: DISCOVERY DISPUTE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/27/2018 Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Allan Kanner, Cindy St. Amant, Ken McClain, Kevin Stanley. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Trent Taylor, Travis Gunn, Brett Shanks. Time in court: 10:00 am to 10:25 am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kathy Calvert, 816-512-5741. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF et al.(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 100 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (185 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 183 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 191 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 166 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 97 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 186 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 211 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 185 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 199 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 196 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 165 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 170 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 180 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 196 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 178 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 167 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 159 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF) MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Exhibits 57, 58 and 96 to Defendants' Class Certification Opposition filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Reply suggestions due by 11/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference to be initiated by plaintiffs' counsel set for 11/27/2018 10:00 AM in before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (185 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 171 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 85 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 159 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 61 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 187 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 164 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 158 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 154 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 172 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 199 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 166 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 90 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 99 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 147 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 184 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 168 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF) MOTION to strike Declaration of Rodrigo R. De Llano filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER directing the parties to include ECF document numbers when referring to documents filed in this case in ALL future pleadings. Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting (179) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (191) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (172) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (177) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (162) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (180) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (170) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (179) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (164) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (175) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (166) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (174) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (190) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (176) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (159) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (185) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (193) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (161) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (205) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (160) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (153) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (125) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (91) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (64) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (102) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (93) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (160) motion for leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (143) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (148) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (139) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (151) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (141) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (150) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (135) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (152) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (143) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (145) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (161) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (153) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (130) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (156) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (164) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (132) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (176) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (130) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (123) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (95) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (61) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (41) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (78) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (70) motion leave to file reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification and exhibits under seal in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 10/18/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 94 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (161 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 180 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 64 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 125 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 91 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 162 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 185 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 177 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 205 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 191 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 160 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 166 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 164 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 102 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 193 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 93 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 175 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 170 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 190 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 159 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 172 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF) MOTION for leave to file Suggestions in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Plaintiffs Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to file Suggestions in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/1/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting (154) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (163) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (146) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (151) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (142) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (154) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (144) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (153) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (138) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (155) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (146) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (148) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (164) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (156) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (133) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (159) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (167) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (135) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (179) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (133) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (126) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (98) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (64) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (44) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (81) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (73) motion to dismiss party Loretta Johnson in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 91 SUGGESTIONS in support re (185 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 171 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 85 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 159 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 61 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 187 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 164 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 158 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 154 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 172 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 199 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 166 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 90 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 99 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 174 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 147 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 184 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 168 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF) MOTION to strike Declaration of Rodrigo R. De Llano filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to strike Declaration of Rodrigo R. De Llano filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 89 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re Exhibits 43 & 44 stricken per Order No. 228 (80 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 168 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 173 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 162 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 173 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 88 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 143 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 136 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 188 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 147 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 157 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 51 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 149 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 162 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 74 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 108 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 160 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF) MOTION to certify class filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Reply suggestions due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 26, #20 Exhibit 27, #21 Exhibit 28, #22 Exhibit 29, #23 Exhibit 30, #24 Exhibit 32, #25 Exhibit 34, #26 Exhibit 36, #27 Exhibit 37, #28 Exhibit 38, #29 Exhibit 39, #30 Exhibit 40, #31 Exhibit 41, #32 Exhibit 42, #33 Exhibit 45, #34 Exhibit 48, #35 Exhibit 49, #36 Exhibit 50, #37 Exhibit 51, #38 Exhibit 52, #39 Exhibit 53, #40 Exhibit 54, #41 Exhibit 55, #42 Exhibit 56, #43 Exhibit 57, #44 Exhibit 58, #45 Exhibit 66, #46 Exhibit 67, #47 Exhibit 68, #48 Exhibit 69, #49 Exhibit 70, #50 Exhibit 71, #51 Exhibit 73, #52 Exhibit 80, #53 Exhibit 87, #54 Exhibit 89, #55 Exhibit 91, #56 Exhibit 92, #57 Exhibit 96, #58 Exhibit 97, #59 Exhibit 98, #60 Exhibit 99, #61 Exhibit 100, #62 Exhibit 101, #63 Exhibit 102, #64 Exhibit 103, #65 Exhibit 104, #66 Exhibit 105, #67 Exhibit 106, #68 Exhibit 107, #69 Exhibit 108, #70 Exhibit 109, #71 Exhibit 110, #72 Exhibit 111, #73 Exhibit 112)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) Modified on 3/28/2019 (Houston, Kiambu). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to seal document Unredacted Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION to seal document filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 86 Joint MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER finding as moot (166) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; finding as moot (176) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; finding as moot (158) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; finding as moot (163) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; finding as moot (152) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; finding as moot (166) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; finding as moot (156) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; finding as moot (165) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; finding as moot (150) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; finding as moot (165) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; finding as moot (156) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; finding as moot (160) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; finding as moot (176) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; finding as moot (166) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; finding as moot (145) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; finding as moot (171) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; finding as moot (179) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; finding as moot (147) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; finding as moot (191) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; finding as moot (146) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; finding as moot (139) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; finding as moot (111) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; finding as moot (77) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; finding as moot (54) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; finding as moot (91) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; finding as moot (83) motion maintain documents under seal in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 9/21/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of filing Notice Regarding Deadline for Defendants' Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC (Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for order to Maintain Documents Under Seal filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 81 SUGGESTIONS in support re Exhibit 36 stricken per Order No. 228 (80 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) MOTION to certify class filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Plaintiffs Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22, #15 Exhibit 23, #16 Exhibit 24, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 31, #20 Exhibit 35, #21 Exhibit 38, #22 Exhibit 40, #23 Exhibit 41, #24 Exhibit 42, #25 Exhibit 43, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 59, #28 Exhibit 60, #29 Exhibit 62, #30 Exhibit 65, #31 Exhibit 69, #32 Exhibit 80, #33 Exhibit 82, #34 Exhibit 83, #35 Exhibit 84, #36 Exhibit 86)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) Modified on 3/28/2019 (Houston, Kiambu). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION to certify class filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to file Corrected Motion for Class Cerification filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to file Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for order File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying (150) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; denying (159) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; denying (142) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; denying (147) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; denying (138) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; denying (150) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; denying (140) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; denying (149) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; denying (134) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; denying (151) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; denying (142) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; denying (144) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; denying (160) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; denying (152) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; denying (129) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; denying (155) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; denying (163) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; denying (131) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; denying (175) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; denying (129) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; denying (122) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; denying (94) Sealed Motion. in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; denying (60) Sealed Motion. in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; denying (40) Sealed Motion. in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; denying (77) Sealed Motion. in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; denying (69) Sealed Motion. in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 8/22/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 74 SUGGESTIONS in support re (154 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 159 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 163 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 98 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 138 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 164 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 167 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 146 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 81 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 151 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 135 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 148 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 133 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 154 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 146 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 126 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 179 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 73 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 156 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 133 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 64 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 44 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF) MOTION to dismiss party Johnson filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to dismiss party Johnson filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 72 SUGGESTIONS in support re (152 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 152 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 161 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 96 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 146 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 151 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 62 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 162 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 165 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 177 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 157 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 133 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 136 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 79 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 42 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 154 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 71 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 149 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF) MOTION to certify class , (159 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 77 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 134 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 175 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 122 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 160 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 163 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 147 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 60 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 149 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 150 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 40 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 150 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 142 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 94 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 69 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 151 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 138 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 152 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF) MOTION for Order (SEALED) to File Exhibits Under Seal, (150 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 156 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 160 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 95 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 151 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 70 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 123 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 41 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 143 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 139 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 151 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 143 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 61 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 152 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 161 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 141 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 176 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 135 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 148 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 164 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 145 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 78 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 132 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 153 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF) MOTION for order to File Exhibits Under Seal re (69 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) MOTION for Order (SEALED) to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of Plaintiffs Matthew Wait, Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Leonard Karpeichik, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Will Sisemore, Robert Oren, Roger Barrows, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Hector Balderas, Kevin Gadson, Chuck Hill, Seit Alla, Hector Balderas, Bradford Barfoot, Roger Barrows, Allen Brown, Milton M. Cooke Jr., Michael Deck, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, Chuck Hill, Howard Horgan, Leonard Karpeichik, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Will Sisemore, Gerardo Solis, State of Mississippi, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Matthew Wait, Jason Wood, Milton M. Cooke Jr., Michael Deck, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Howard Horgan, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 22, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 29, #18 Exhibit 31, #19 Exhibit 35, #20 Exhibit 38, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41, #23 Exhibit 42, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 45, #26 Exhibit 59, #27 Exhibit 60, #28 Exhibit 62, #29 Exhibit 65, #30 Exhibit 69, #31 Exhibit 80, #32 Exhibit 82, #33 Exhibit 83, #34 Exhibit 84, #35 Exhibit 86)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION to certify class filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for order to File Exhibits Under Seal re (69 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) MOTION for Order (SEALED) to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Jason Wood, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Bradford Barfoot, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(McClain, Kenneth) NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/20/2018. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word or WordPerfect format. Modified on 8/21/2018 (Crocker, Susan). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Kenneth B. McClain on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Attorney Kenneth B. McClain added to party Seit Alla(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth B. McClain added to party Howard Horgan(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth B. McClain added to party Brandon Raab(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth B. McClain added to party Brandon Raab(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth B. McClain added to party Howard Horgan(pty:pla))(McClain, Kenneth) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting (127) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (133) motion for discovery in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (119) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (124) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (116) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (127) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (117) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (126) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (111) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (129) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (120) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (121) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (137) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (130) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (106) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (128) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (140) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (108) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (152) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (106) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (99) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (71) motion for discovery in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (37) motion for discovery in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (18) motion for discovery in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (55) motion for discovery in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (47) motion for discovery in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 8/6/2018 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting (147) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (154) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (139) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (144) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (147) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (137) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (146) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (131) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (141) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (157) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (126) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (148) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (160) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (128) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (172) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (126) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (119) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (91) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (57) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF Signed on 8/6/2018 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting (145) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (152) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (137) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (142) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (134) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (145) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (135) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (144) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (129) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (147) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (138) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (139) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (155) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (148) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (124) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (146) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (158) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (126) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (170) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (124) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (117) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (89) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (55) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (36) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (73) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (65) motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Daniel M Mahfood terminated in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF Signed on 5/31/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 64 SUR-REPLY to motion re (152 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 71 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 18 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 111 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 37 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 117 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 133 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 128 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 126 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 47 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 116 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 99 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 121 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 137 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 108 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 55 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 38 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF) MOTION for discovery sur-reply filed by Kevin Daniel Stanley on behalf of Plaintiffs Matthew Wait, Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Leonard Karpeichik, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Will Sisemore, Robert Oren, Roger Barrows, Jason Wood, State of Mississippi, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Hector Balderas, Kevin Gadson, Chuck Hill, Seit Alla, Hector Balderas, Bradford Barfoot, Roger Barrows, Allen Brown, Milton M. Cooke Jr., Michael Deck, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, Chuck Hill, Howard Horgan, Leonard Karpeichik, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Will Sisemore, Gerardo Solis, State of Mississippi, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Matthew Wait, Jason Wood, Milton M. Cooke Jr., Michael Deck, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Howard Horgan, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Stanley, Kevin) Modified by the Clerk's Office on 4/4/2018 to reflect as sur-reply(Houston, Kiambu). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting (139) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (145) motion to seal document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (131) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (136) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (128) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (139) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (129) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (138) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (123) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (141) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (132) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (133) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (149) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (142) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (118) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (140) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (152) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (120) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (164) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (118) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (111) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (83) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (49) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (30) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (67) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (59) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF; granting (50) motion to seal document in case 4:18-cv-00092-GAF Signed on 4/2/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of appearance by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC (Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting (140) motion for leave to file sur-reply by 4/4/18 in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (146) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (132) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (137) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (129) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (140) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (130) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (139) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (124) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (142) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (133) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (134) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (150) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (143) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (119) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (141) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (153) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (121) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (165) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (119) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (112) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (84) motion for leave to file in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (50) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (31) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (68) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (60) motion for leave to file in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF; granting (51) motion for leave to file in case 4:18-cv-00092-GAF. Signed on 3/28/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Regarding Motion for Additional Discovery filed by Kevin Daniel Stanley on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Seit Alla(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Dolgencorp, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Dollar General Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party State of Mississippi(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Hector Balderas(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Seit Alla(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Hector Balderas(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Howard Horgan(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party State of Mississippi(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Daniel Stanley added to party Howard Horgan(pty:pla))(Stanley, Kevin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to seal document Reply in Support of Motion to Take Additional Discovery filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 58 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (152 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 71 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 18 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 111 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 37 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 117 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 133 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 128 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 126 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 47 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 116 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 99 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 121 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 137 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 108 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 55 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 38 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF) MOTION for discovery filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting (136) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (142) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (128) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (133) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (125) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (136) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (126) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (135) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (120) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (138) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (129) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (130) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (146) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (139) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (115) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (137) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (149) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (117) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (161) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (115) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (108) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (80) motion to withdraw document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (46) motion to withdraw document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (27) motion to withdraw document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (64) motion to withdraw document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (56) motion to withdraw document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF; granting (47) motion to withdraw document in case 4:18-cv-00092-GAF Signed on 3/7/2018 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Houston, Kiambu) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to withdraw document (141 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 156 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 121 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 112 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 115 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 41 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 144 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 59 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 103 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 137 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 51 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 123 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 22 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 75 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 110 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 42 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 125 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 134 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 128 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 132 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 110 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 133 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF) Suggestions in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,, (136 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 74 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 109 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 111 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 40 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 155 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 123 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 50 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 132 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 114 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 122 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 102 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 41 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 109 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 143 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 21 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 133 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 131 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 58 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF) MOTION for order for Costs filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 55 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (152 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 71 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 18 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 111 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 37 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 117 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 133 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 128 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 126 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 47 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 116 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 99 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 121 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 137 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 108 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 55 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 38 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF) MOTION for discovery filed by Cynthia St. Amant on behalf of Plaintiffs Allen Brown, James Taschner, Bradford Barfoot, Gerardo Solis, Seit Alla, John J. McCormick, III, Robert Oren, Roger Barrows, Jason Wood, State of Mississippi, Miriam Fruhling, Janine Harvey, Hector Balderas, Kevin Gadson, Seit Alla, Hector Balderas, Bradford Barfoot, Roger Barrows, Allen Brown, William Flinn, John Foppe, Miriam Fruhling, Kevin Gadson, Bruce Gooel, Janine Harvey, John J. McCormick, III, Nicholas Meyer, Robert Oren, Brandon Raab, Scott Sheehy, Gerardo Solis, State of Mississippi, James Taschner, Roberto Vega, Jason Wood, Brandon Raab, Roberto Vega, WILLIAM FLINN, Nicholas Meyer, Bruce Gooel, John Foppe, Scott Sheehy. Reply suggestions due by 3/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Attorney Cynthia St. Amant added to party State of Mississippi(pty:pla), Attorney Cynthia St. Amant added to party Hector Balderas(pty:pla), Attorney Cynthia St. Amant added to party Hector Balderas(pty:pla))(St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting (132) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (138) motion to seal document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (124) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (129) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (121) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (132) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (122) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (131) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (116) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (134) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (125) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (126) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (142) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (135) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (111) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (133) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (145) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (113) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (157) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (111) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (104) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (76) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (42) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (23) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (60) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (52) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF; granting (43) motion to seal document in case 4:18-cv-00092-GAF Signed on 2/22/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting (129) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00105-GAF; granting (135) motion to seal document in case 4:16-md-02709-GAF; granting (121) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00522-GAF; granting (126) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00528-GAF; granting (118) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00534-GAF; granting (129) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00523-GAF; granting (119) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00529-GAF; granting (128) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00520-GAF; granting (113) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00525-GAF; granting (131) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00532-GAF; granting (122) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00517-GAF; granting (123) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00531-GAF; granting (139) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00526-GAF; granting (132) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00533-GAF; granting (108) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00530-GAF; granting (130) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00518-GAF; granting (142) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00519-GAF; granting (110) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00524-GAF; granting (154) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00521-GAF; granting (108) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00606-GAF; granting (101) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00607-GAF; granting (73) motion to seal document in case 4:16-cv-00868-GAF; granting (39) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00413-GAF; granting (20) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00584-GAF; granting (57) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00831-GAF; granting (49) motion to seal document in case 4:17-cv-00832-GAF; granting (40) motion to seal document in case 4:18-cv-00092-GAF Signed on 2/22/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to seal document Suggestions in Support of Motion for Additional Discovery filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 48 SUGGESTIONS in support re (152 in 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 71 in 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 18 in 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 127 in 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 130 in 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 111 in 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 37 in 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 117 in 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 119 in 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 124 in 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 133 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 120 in 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 128 in 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 126 in 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 47 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 116 in 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 99 in 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 129 in 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 121 in 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 137 in 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 106 in 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 108 in 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 55 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 38 in 4:18-cv-00092-GAF, 140 in 4:16-cv-00519-GAF) MOTION for discovery (redacted version) filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Defendants Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for discovery filed by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 4:18-cv-00092-GAF(Attorney Brett A Shanks added to party Dolgencorp LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brett A Shanks added to party Dollar General Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Brett A Shanks added to party Dolgencorp LLC(pty:dft))(Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of appearance by Brett A Shanks on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp LLC, DG Retail LLC, Dollar General, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC (Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of filing Supplemental Notice Regarding New Mexico and Attorney General Balderas's Notice of Objection of Application of Case Management and Scheduling Order by Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation re (44 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF, 50 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF) Notice of filing, (43 in 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 41 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) Notice of filing (Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of filing RESPONSE TO NEW MEXICO AND ATTORNEY GENERAL BALDERASS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO APPLICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDERS by Dolgencorp LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General, Dollar General Corporation, Dollar General Corporation re (41 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) Notice of filing (Shanks, Brett) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER withdrawing appearance of Mark R. Cuker for plaintiffs re (42 in 4:17-cv-00832-GAF) Notice of filing filed by Seit Alla. Signed on 10/19/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Associated Cases: 4:16-md-02709-GAF, 4:16-cv-00105-GAF, 4:16-cv-00517-GAF, 4:16-cv-00518-GAF, 4:16-cv-00519-GAF, 4:16-cv-00520-GAF, 4:16-cv-00521-GAF, 4:16-cv-00522-GAF, 4:16-cv-00523-GAF, 4:16-cv-00524-GAF, 4:16-cv-00525-GAF, 4:16-cv-00526-GAF, 4:16-cv-00528-GAF, 4:16-cv-00529-GAF, 4:16-cv-00530-GAF, 4:16-cv-00531-GAF, 4:16-cv-00532-GAF, 4:16-cv-00533-GAF, 4:16-cv-00534-GAF, 4:16-cv-00606-GAF, 4:16-cv-00607-GAF, 4:16-cv-00868-GAF, 4:17-cv-00413-GAF, 4:17-cv-00584-GAF, 4:17-cv-00831-GAF, 4:17-cv-00832-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of filing Withdrawal of Appearance by Seit Alla (Cuker, Mark) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of filing Objection to Application of Case Management and Scheduling Orders by Hector Balderas, Hector H. Balderas re (23 in 4:16-md-02709-GAF) Scheduling Order,,,, (St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:17-cv-00772. [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 39 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2709) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Gary A. Fenner. (MDL-2709). (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 38 FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/31/2017 at 09:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (anl) Modified on 9/14/2017 (vv). [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FILED IN ERROR-ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings. (anl) Modified on 9/14/2017 (vv). [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 36 FILED IN ERROR-NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Dolgencorp LLC re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Rinner, Todd) Modified TEXT on 8/31/2017 (vv). [pleadings to be filed in lead case only] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 35 FILED IN ERROR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6) (Rinner, Todd) Modified TEXT on 8/31/2017 (vv) [pleadings to be filed in lead case only]. [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 34 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge James O. Browning, Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE by District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. 17-CV-588 and 17-CV-772 are consolidated for all uproses. 17-CV-588 shall be the lead case and all pleadings shall be docketed to this case ntil further notice of the Court. (anl) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Hector Balderas re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR COSTS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Hector Balderas (St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR COSTS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Hector Balderas. (St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Hector Balderas. (St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5353026 re: # 29 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Brouk, Allison) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 29 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Allison Brouk (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Brouk, Allison)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5353015 re: # 26 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(St. Amant, Cynthia) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5353013 re: # 28 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kanner, Allan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 28 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Allan Kanner (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kanner, Allan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5353011 re: # 27 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Whiteley, Conlee) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 27 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Conlee Whiteley (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Whiteley, Conlee)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 26 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Cynthia St. Amant (Association Dues - Online Payment) (St. Amant, Cynthia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE by Hector Balderas of Certification of Good Standing of Allison Shipp Brouk (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Hector Balderas of Certification of Good Standing of Cynthia St. Amant (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE by Hector Balderas of Certification of Good Standing of Conlee Whiteley (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE by Hector Balderas of Certification of Good Standing of Allan Kanner (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR COSTS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Hector Balderas. (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hector Balderas. (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 15. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Vacating Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2017 and all deadlines set forth in #4 Initial Scheduling Order. (hm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 16 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5343293 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5343288 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5343278 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5343270 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dolgencorp LLC by Todd Rinner on behalf of: Travis C. Gunn McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal StreetRichmond, VA 23219 804-775-1182 tgunn@mcguirewoods.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rinner, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dolgencorp LLC by Todd Rinner on behalf of: Jontille D. Ray McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal StreetRichmond, VA 23219 804-775-1182 jray@mcguirewoods.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rinner, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dolgencorp LLC by Todd Rinner on behalf of: Perry W. Miles, IV McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal StreetRichmond, VA 23219 804-775-1182 pmiles@mcguirewoods.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rinner, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dolgencorp LLC by Todd Rinner on behalf of: R. Trent Taylor McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal StreetRichmond, VA 23219 804-775-1182 rtaylor@mcguirewoods.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rinner, Todd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE by Dolgencorp LLC of Certification of Good Standing for R. Trent Taylor, Perry W. Miles IV, Jontille D. Ray, and Travis C. Gunn (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND FOR COSTS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Hector Balderas. (Cameron, Scott) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (hm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dolgencorp LLC. (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2017. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/6/2017. (hm) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 26, 2017 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5316869 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Dolgencorp LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE by Dolgencorp LLC -- Notification of Multidistrict Litigation (Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dolgencorp LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2017-01562. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rinner, Todd) [Transferred from nmd on 10/10/2017.] [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balderas v. Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Travis C. Gunn
Represented By: Perry W. Miles
Represented By: Brett A Shanks
Represented By: Jontille D. Ray
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: R. Trent Taylor
Represented By: Todd Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Scott C Cameron
Represented By: Kevin Daniel Stanley
Represented By: Conlee Whiteley
Represented By: Allison Brouk
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Represented By: Cynthia St. Amant
Represented By: Cynthia St Amant
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?