Ammons et al v. Sentry Insurance

Plaintiff: Jessica Ammons and Shawn Ammons
Defendant: Sentry Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00419
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons re #18 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, and Vacate Deadliens in Initial Scheduling Order Pending Rulingon Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Extra-Contractual Discovery Notice of Agreement of Extension of Time for Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants to File a Response (Grayson, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons. (Grayson, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint - UIM Benefits filed by Shawn Ammons, Jessica Ammons (Grayson, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint - UIM Benefits filed by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons. (Grayson, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, and Vacate Deadlines in Initial Scheduling Order Pending Ruling on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Alternatively to Bifurcate and Stay Extra-Contractual Discovery by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Noya, Jennifer) Modified docket text on 6/20/2019 (khs).
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Noya, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint - UIM Benefits filed by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Noya, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for July 24, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by July 17, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than July 5, 2019. (plp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Shawn Ammons, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Sentry Insurance Company, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Jessica Ammons. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint - UIM Benefits by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- police report of theft, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - police report of recovery, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - December 12, 2018 e-mail string, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Demand to Sentry, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - E-mail re demand to Sentry, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6- Denial Letter from Dan Lewis, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - E-mail to Lewis, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - E-mail to Lewis, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Ltr to Lewis re final demand, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - final denial letter from Lewis) (Grayson, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons of Initial Disclosures (Grayson, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian G. Grayson (Grayson, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons (Grayson, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants' ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons.(Grayson, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jessica Ammons voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Grayson, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Shawn Ammons voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Grayson, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Sentry Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Noya, Jennifer)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Sentry Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Noya, Jennifer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Sentry's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Jessica Ammons, Shawn Ammons by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Noya, Jennifer)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya R. Burke on behalf of Sentry Insurance Company (Burke, Sonya)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
May 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (mnb)
May 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6420934 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SENTRY INSURANCE a MUTUAL COMPANY (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SENTRY INSURANCE a MUTUAL COMPANY from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, County of Valencia, case number D-1314-CV-2019-00432. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by SENTRY INSURANCE a MUTUAL COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noya, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammons et al v. Sentry Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ammons
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Ammons
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?