Tratt Industries, LLC et al v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Shepard, Tratt Industries, LLC and Troy Baker
Defendant: Sunbelt New Mexico Business Brokerage, LLC, Michael Greene and Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Dwight L Patterson and Laurie M Patterson
3Rd Party Defendant: Xitech Instruments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00498
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Atkinson, Baker & Rodriguez, PC terminated. (kfg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Motion , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Troy Baker, Matthew Shepard, Tratt Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Proposed Order) (Atkinson, Clifford)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 Defendants Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC, d/b/a Sam Goldenberg & Associates, Sunbelt New Mexico Business Brokerage, LLC and Michael Greene ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Tratt Industries, LLC.(Ackermann, Laura)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued on Third Party Complaint as to Xitech Instruments, Inc.. (jg)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Parties to meet and confer by 8/2/2019. Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 Patterson Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Damages against Xitech Instruments, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM for Damages and Accounting against Troy Baker, Matthew Shepard, Tratt Industries, LLC by Dwight L Patterson, Laurie M Patterson. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Tratt Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC re #1 Complaint, Stipulated Notice of Extension of Time to file Answer ime (Biehler, Gregory)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC Stipulated Notice of Extension of Time (Ackermann, Laura)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. Michael Greene served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. Sunbelt New Mexico Business Brokerage, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. Laurie M Patterson served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tratt Industries, LLC, Matthew Shepard, Troy Baker. Dwight L Patterson served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Atkinson, Clifford)
May 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Michael Greene, Dwight L Patterson individually and as Trustee, Laurie M Patterson individually and as Trustee, Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC, Sunbelt New Mexico Business Brokerage, LLC. (ln)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Troy Baker, Matthew Shepard, Tratt Industries, LLC (Atkinson, Clifford)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
May 30, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, Cover Sheet by Tratt Industries, LLC (Atkinson, Clifford)
May 30, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6454784 re #1 Complaint, filed by Tratt Industries, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Atkinson, Clifford)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified for Breach of Contract, Fraud, Negligent Misrepresentation, Civil Conspiracy and Rescission against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tratt Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Atkinson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tratt Industries, LLC et al v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt New Mexico Business Brokerage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Business Brokers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dwight L Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Laurie M Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shepard
Represented By: Rebecca Sitterly
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tratt Industries, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Sitterly
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Baker
Represented By: Rebecca Sitterly
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Xitech Instruments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?