Salazar v. PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pete D. Salazar
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC, Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Weinstein & Riley, P.S. and PennyMac Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00517
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by PennyMac Corp., PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC, PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, PennyMac Corp. (McKleroy, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motions: #5 MOTION to Dismiss and #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Weinstein & Riley, P.S. re #7 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Weinstein & Riley, P.S. (Bousliman, Jason)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , First MOTION to Dismiss by Weinstein & Riley, P.S.. (Bousliman, Jason)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Bousliman on behalf of Weinstein & Riley, P.S. (Bousliman, Jason)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by PennyMac Corp., PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15) (McKleroy, Michael)
June 6, 2019 District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales assigned. (khs)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6466680 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (khs)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Corp., PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC (McKleroy, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 13th Judicial District of the State of New Mexico, County of Sandoval, case number D-1329-cv-2019-01118. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(McKleroy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC
Represented By: Michael McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weinstein & Riley, P.S.
Represented By: Jason C Bousliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Corp.
Represented By: Michael McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete D. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?