Hart v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Hart
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00529
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Hart Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Hansen, Heather)
July 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #12 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. The Telephone Scheduling Conference scheduled for 08/01/2019 is VACATED and rescheduled for 08/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Stiff, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant To File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan. JSR due 07/23/2019. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline for Defendant to File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan "JSR" by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stiff, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/1/2019. (kc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
June 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (mnb)
June 7, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6472163 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stiff, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-02870. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stiff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John S. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hart
Represented By: Heather K Hansen
Represented By: Eva K. Blazejewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?