Reuler v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Susan Reuler
Defendant: Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00544
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC Notice of Leave of Absence from September 25, 2019 October 4, 2019. (Willis, Amelia) Modified on 9/17/2019 (vv).
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Susan Reuler Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures (Ray, Marshall)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC re initial disclosures (Willis, Amelia) Modified on 8/15/2019 (vv).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT #13 filed by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning. Discovery due by 1/13/2020. Motions due by 2/13/2020. Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to the direction of District Judge James O. Browning, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is vacated per the parties Waiver of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference [Doc. 14]. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cab)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC Waiver of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Willis, Amelia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Status Report by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC (Willis, Amelia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED. The Honorable James O. Browning will conduct pretrial discovery and will set an Initial Scheduling Conference. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/8/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/12/2019. (pv)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 8/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/5/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/12/2019. (pv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC (Willis, Amelia)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC. (Willis, Amelia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by McKesson Corporation (Willis, Amelia)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6484682 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKesson Corporation, Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Willis, Amelia)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (khs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, McKesson Corporation from Second Judicial Court of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2019-02152. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Wilkinson Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Willis, Amelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reuler v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Healthcare Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Amelia M Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Amelia M Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Reuler
Represented By: Marshall J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?