Dunn v. North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility
Plaintiff: Woodrow Dunn
Defendant: Northeastern New Mexico Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2019cv00548
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying #6 , #7 and #8 motions to submit evidence and staying prescreening obligations. (bni)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Woodrow Dunn (vv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re newly obtained evidence by Woodrow Dunn (vv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of removal by Woodrow Dunn (vv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re new evidence by Woodrow Dunn (vv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Northeastern New Mexico Detention Facility (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (White, April)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to submit evidence by Woodrow Dunn. (bap)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to submit evidence by Woodrow Dunn. (bap)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to submit evidence by Woodrow Dunn. (bap)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
June 14, 2019 District Judge James O. Browning and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (khs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility Statement Regarding 42 USC 1997e(g) and 28 USC 1915A (White, April)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility (White, April)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by April D. White on behalf of North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility (White, April)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6484025 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility (Payment made via Pay.gov)(White, April)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-03556. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. North Eastern New Mexico Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodrow Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeastern New Mexico Detention Facility
Represented By: April D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?