Gonzales v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Arthur M. Gonzales
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00554
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Arlen Thomas on behalf of Social Security Administration (Thomas, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Arthur M. Gonzales and 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB043903 (ar)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Arthur M. Gonzales voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Armstrong, Michael)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (khs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Arthur M. Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Armstrong, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Michael Arlen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur M. Gonzales
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?