Commercial Credit Group Inc. v. Protege Excavation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Commercial Credit Group Inc.
Defendant: Protege Excavation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00558
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Commercial Credit Group Inc. re #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Sohn, Jeanne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Replevin) (mlt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Expedited Ex Parte Writ Hearing held on 7/30/2019. (plp)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Ex Parte Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Setting and Request for Expedited Ex Parte Hearing. Ex Parte Hearing set for July 30, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in the Hondo Courtroom (440) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (plp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales referring #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Setting and Request for Expedited Ex Parte Hearing to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (tah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint by Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Sohn, Jeanne)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA re #1 Complaint by Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D) (Sohn, Jeanne)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6485857 re #1 Complaint filed by Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sohn, Jeanne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commercial Credit Group Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Sohn, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commercial Credit Group Inc. v. Protege Excavation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial Credit Group Inc.
Represented By: Jeanne Y Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protege Excavation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?