Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Avtar Singh and Major Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00562
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 11 and 12. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Vacating Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 6). All instructions, deadlines, and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order are VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Major Transportation, Inc. (Riley, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Avtar Singh (Riley, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Major Transportation, Inc.. (Riley, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Avtar Singh. (Riley, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/15/2019. (smd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6490394 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Notice of Consent for Removal by Major Transportation, Inc., Avtar Singh (Riley, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Major Transportation, Inc., Avtar Singh (Riley, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Major Transportation, Inc., Avtar Singh Notice of Removal from State of New Mexico County of Cibola Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1333-CV-2019-00010. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Major Transportation, Inc., Avtar Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Riley, Mark) Modified Exhibit 3 security on 6/18/2019 (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avtar Singh
Represented By: Taryn Kaselonis
Represented By: Mark J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Taryn Kaselonis
Represented By: Mark J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul M. Kienzle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?