Flasch v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Patricia Flasch
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00592
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Johansen, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Johansen, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Johansen, James)
August 2, 2019 Chief District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to case. (jg)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 8/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/22/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/26/2019. (pv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Breach of Contract for Failure to Pay Underinsured Motorist Benefits by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Johansen, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 27, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
June 27, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6510443 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johansen, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Johansen, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company from 1st Judicial District of NM, Count of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2019-01043. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Johansen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flasch v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Headrick
Represented By: James H. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Flasch
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?