Martinez v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Eli Martinez
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00615
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eli Martinez. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (ln)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eli Martinez. United States Attorney General served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (ln)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eli Martinez. Social Security Administration served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (ln)
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States Attorney, the Attorney General, and the Office of the General Counsel, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). (kfg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (khs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Martinez
Represented By: Benjamin Eilers Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?