Farrar v. Dillard's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Farrar
Defendant: Trademark Property Company, Dillard's Properties, Inc., Spinoso Real Estate Group, Dillard's Inc., Construction Developers, Inc., Dillard Store Services, Inc. and Torchlight Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00616
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 27 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2019. (kfg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Amended Pleadings due for Plaintiff by 10/1/2019 and for Defendant by 11/1/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Discovery Motions due by 6/23/2020 and Pretrial Motions due by 7/2/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff by 10/1/2020 and from Defendant by 10/16/2020. (kfg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC (Riley, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Construction Developers, Inc., Dillard Store Services, Inc., Dillard's Inc., Dillard's Properties, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Reed, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jean Farrar Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Defendant Dillard Store Services, Inc. (Branch, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jean Farrar Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Defendant Spinoso Real Estate Group (Branch, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jean Farrar Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents to Defendant Trademark Property Company (Branch, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Torchlight Loan Services, LLC Initial Disclosures (Riley, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spinoso Real Estate Group Initial Disclosures (Riley, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jean Farrar Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Branch, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 14 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Trademark Property Company, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Torchlight Loan Services, LLC, 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Jean Farrar, 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Spinoso Real Estate Group, 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Construction Developers, Inc., Dillard Store Services, Inc., Dillard's Properties, Inc., Dillard's Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Construction Developers, Inc., Dillard Store Services, Inc., Dillard's Inc., Dillard's Properties, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Reed, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Trademark Property Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Groman, Kristin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Spinoso Real Estate Group voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Riley, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Torchlight Loan Services, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Riley, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jean Farrar voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Branch, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Construction Developers, Inc.. (Reed, Christopher)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/30/2019. (kfg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Torchlight Loan Services, LLC (Riley, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Spinoso Real Estate Group (Riley, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Torchlight Loan Services, LLC. (Riley, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Spinoso Real Estate Group. (Riley, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 3, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)
July 3, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6523207 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Riley, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Notice of Consent for Removal by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC (Riley, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Riley, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC from First Judicial District Court County of Santa Fe State of New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2019-00951. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Spinoso Real Estate Group, Torchlight Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Riley, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrar v. Dillard's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trademark Property Company
Represented By: Kristin L. Groman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinoso Real Estate Group
Represented By: Mathew R Wadsworth
Represented By: Mark J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Developers, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torchlight Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Mathew R Wadsworth
Represented By: Mark J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Farrar
Represented By: Brian K. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?