Santiesteban v. USA
Petitioner: Jaime Santiesteban
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00623
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James A Parker
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File 28 USC 2255 by Jaime Santiesteban. (bap)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting Petitioner Jaime Santiesteban extension of time until 9/30/2019 to file an amended Motion for 2255 (bap)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE re #2 Order, filed by Jaime Santiesteban. (bap)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker that Jaime Santiesteban is granted leave to amend or withdraw his Plea for Consideration of Sentence re #1 by 8/5/2019. (bap)
July 9, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Davis), filed by Jaime Santiesteban. (bap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiesteban v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Santiesteban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?