Trinity Pest Control LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Charles Carroll, Trinity Pest Control and Trinity Pest Control LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to VACATE the telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque and all associated deadlines. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 ERRATA re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Marshall, Gregory)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Marshall, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Charles Carroll, Trinity Pest Control LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gatton, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 16, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (jv)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Notice of Withdrawal (Marshall, Gregory)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Marshall, Gregory)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., answer due 8/1/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED]. (cda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Marshall, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/16/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/5/2019. (cda)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 11, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
July 11, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6536924 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marshall, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from State of New Mexico Second Judicial Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-04515. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Marshall, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Pest Control LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Joshua Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carroll
Represented By: Christopher M Gatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Pest Control
Represented By: Christopher M Gatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Pest Control LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Gatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?