McCormick 102, LLC v. Rietech Global, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: MCCORMICK 102, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company and McCormick 102, LLC
Defendant: Richard Engstrom, State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions, Rietech Holdings, LLC, a New Mexico limited liability company, Ioana Engstrom, Sagebrush Technology, Inc., a Delaware limited liability company, United States of America Internal Revenue Service, Rietech Global, LLC, a New Mexico limited liability company, Rietech Global, LLC, Sagebrush Technology, Inc., Rietech Holdings, LLC and United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00651
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC. United States of America - Internal Revenue Service served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Odom, Suzanne)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 FILED IN ERROR-Unopposed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by McCormick 102, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Form of Judgment) (Odom, Suzanne) Modified on 9/3/2019 (vv).
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC as to Rietech Global, LLC. (Brooks, Kaleb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC as to Rietech Holdings, LLC. (Brooks, Kaleb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC as to Sagebrush Technology, Inc.. (Brooks, Kaleb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC as to Richard Engstrom. (Brooks, Kaleb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC as to Ioana Engstrom. (Brooks, Kaleb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McCormick 102, LLC. State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Brooks, Kaleb)
July 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ioana Engstrom, Richard Engstrom, Rietech Global, LLC, Rietech Holdings, LLC, Sagebrush Technology, Inc., State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions, United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. (jg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #6 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. (plp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by McCormick 102, LLC. (Brooks, Kaleb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by McCormick 102, LLC Notice of Errata to Correct Case Caption (Brooks, Kaleb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaleb W. Brooks on behalf of McCormick 102, LLC (Brooks, Kaleb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 71424 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by MCCORMICK 102, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S)(O'Reilly, Dylan) filed by McCormick 102, LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by MCCORMICK 102, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(O'Reilly, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick 102, LLC v. Rietech Global, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions
Represented By: Andrea K. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rietech Holdings, LLC, a New Mexico limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ioana Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagebrush Technology, Inc., a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rietech Global, LLC, a New Mexico limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rietech Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagebrush Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rietech Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCCORMICK 102, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company
Represented By: Dylan O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCormick 102, LLC
Represented By: Dylan O'Reilly
Represented By: Kaleb W. Brooks
Represented By: Suzanne C Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?