Griego et al v. American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, et al.
Plaintiff: Sam Aragon and Albina Griego
Defendant: FNU Does, American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas and Entities Corporations Partnerships
Case Number: 1:2019cv00664
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albina Griego (Rios, Linda)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas of Service of Initial Disclosures (Collins, Jill)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Status Report by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas (Collins, Jill)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Collins, Jill)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Albina Griego. (Rios, Linda)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas (Collins, Jill)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/19/2019. (kfg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas of Good Standing of Attorney Rebecca Weinreich (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Collins, Jill)
July 19, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6553905 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Jill)
July 19, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6553895 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Jill)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 19, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant American Hallmark Insurance Co. of Texas by Jill M Collins on behalf of: Rebecca Weinreich Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith 633 West 5th Street, Ste 4000Los Angeles, CA 90071 213-580-7973 Fax 213-250-7900 rebecca.weinreich@lewisbrisbois.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Collins, Jill)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Hallmark Insurance Co. of Texas from Second District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-07627. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by American Hallmark Insurance Co. of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griego et al v. American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Aragon
Represented By: Michael G. Solon
Represented By: Linda J Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albina Griego
Represented By: Michael G. Solon
Represented By: Linda J Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Represented By: Rebecca Weinreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entities Corporations Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?