Meredith v. Binali et al
Plaintiff: Carol Meredith
Defendant: Proud Eagle Express, Inc. and Ilim S. Binali
Case Number: 1:2019cv00668
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Service by Carol Meredith re Initial Disclsures. (Caruso, Mark) Modified docket text on 9/5/2019 (ln).
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ilim S. Binali, Proud Eagle Express, Inc. re Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Vigil, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Disclosure Plts Initial Disclosures by Carol Meredith. (Caruso, Mark) Modified docket text on 9/5/2019 (ln).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 2/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 1/27/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiffs' demand letter is due to Defendants by 1/10/2020. Defendants' counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiffs by 1/22/2020. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 1/24/2020. (kys)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs to seek leave to join parties and amend pleadings by November 1, 2019; Defendants to seek leave to join parties and amend pleadings by November 15, 2019; Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosures due by March 11, 2020; Defendants' expert witness disclosures due by April 13, 2020; discovery to be completed by May 15, 2020; discovery motions to be filed by June 5, 2020; pretrial motions to be filed by June 15, 2020; and, proposed pretrial order due from Plaintiffs to Defendants by September 4, 2020 and from Defendants to the Court by September 18, 2020. (kys)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2019. (kys)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Status Report Joint Status Report by Carol Meredith (Caruso, Mark)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ilim S. Binali, Proud Eagle Express, Inc.. (Vigil, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/12/2019. (kys)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 19, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
July 19, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6554580 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Proud Eagle Express, Inc., Ilim S. Binali (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vigil, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District, case number D-424-CV-2019-00039. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vigil, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. Binali et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Meredith
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proud Eagle Express, Inc.
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilim S. Binali
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?