Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Picazo et al
Plaintiff: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Bryce Gomez, The Estate of Kayden Montoya, The Estate of Jakob Montoya and Miguel Picazo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00674
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Vacating Initial Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. In light of the Court's Order #6 granting the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, the Court hereby VACATES all deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order entered on 8/23/2019. #4 The Court will reset deadlines and the Initial Scheduling Conference if appropriate after the stay is lifted.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kys)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Proceedings in this case are hereby stayed for ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. (kys)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Keller, Courtenay)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/16/2019. (kys)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Miguel Picazo. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Ellis, James)
July 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
July 22, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6557787 re #1 Complaint filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keller, Courtenay)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 22, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by garrison property and casualty insurance company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Courtenay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Picazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Kayden Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Jakob Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Picazo
Represented By: James C. Ellis
Represented By: Daniel Philip Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?