Hunt v. Waters et al
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt
Defendant: Jack V Waters, Allied Professionals Insurance Company, The National Chiropractic Council, Jack V. Waters, Jack V. Waters D.C., P.C. and Allied Professionals Insurance Co., a Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00701
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lee Hunt re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Fees Incurred as a Result of Improper Removal filed by Lee Hunt (Miera-Rosete, Mixcoati)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Fees Incurred as a Result of Improper Removal filed by Lee Hunt. (Miera-Rosete, Mixcoati)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Fees Incurred as a Result of Improper Removal filed by Allied Professionals Insurance Co., a Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Biehler, Gregory)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY FEDERAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING DETERMINATION OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs' and Defendants Allied Professionals Insurance Co.'s and The National Chiropractic Council's Joint Motion to Stay Federal Proceedings Pending Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. 10) is granted. All pretrial deadlines are stayed in this case until the Court has issued a ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Fees Incurred as a Result of Improper Removal (Doc. 5). (kmt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Federal Court Proceedings Pending Determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Lee Hunt. (Miera-Rosete, Mixcoati)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge unless consents from all parties have been filed on or before August 23, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mixcoati Q Miera-Rosete on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miera-Rosete, Mixcoati)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Fees Incurred as a Result of Improper Removal by Lee Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Miera-Rosete, Mixcoati)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Connect conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to join the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/23/2019. (tkl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 1, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Professionals Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit) (Biehler, Gregory) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jg).
July 31, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6577928 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The National Chiropractic Council (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR - DOCUMENTS NOT ATTACHED*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The National Chiropractic Council from First Judicial District Court Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2018-02249. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The National Chiropractic Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biehler, Gregory) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Waters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack V Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Professionals Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Chiropractic Council
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack V. Waters
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Represented By: Donna L Chapman
Represented By: Mitchell J. Freedman
Represented By: Jessica D Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack V. Waters D.C., P.C.
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Represented By: Donna L Chapman
Represented By: Mitchell J. Freedman
Represented By: Jessica D Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Professionals Insurance Co., a Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Mixcoatl Q. Miera-Rosete
Represented By: A. Elicia Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?