Allen et al v. Weston Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fannie Marie Jim, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Leonard Lee, Rosina T Merritt, Ruby B Silas, Jean Jones, Gary Smith, George L Sisco, Emerson Lee, Anita Hayes, Vernon Phillips, Juanita Kee, Lena J Jones, Cecilia Wallace, Wade Shorthair, Susie Scott, Roger Shaggy, Emma Mitchell, Evelyn M Lee, Estate of Rose Merritt, Joe C Allen, Mary Clark, Huron Etsitty, Mary Jay, Reyvette Grey, Tom Horse, Ruby Nelson, Doris Coolidge, Daisy Barber, Lucy Dick, Gerald Maryboy, Harold Williams, Sandra Begay, Shirley Bia, Alice Begay, Sarah Frank, Wilma Charley, Bessie S Pelt, Janice Terri Brown, Marie Yazzie, Raymond G Sells, Jacqueline L. Begay, Beverly Maxwell, Scott Brady, Sherrell G Mesa, Albert H Lee, Harry Lane, Laura M Mitchell, Eric Smallcanyon, Anne Johnson, Esther A Yanito, Irita James, Elsie Joe, Darrell Jim, Janice Frank, Harry Peshlakai, Lorenzo Yazzie, Rena Fasthorse, Harrison Johnson, Raymond G Willie, Darlene Bronston, Theron Jones, Ramona Pettigrew, Jeannie Benally, Herman Enoah, Stella Cly, Tommy Draper, David Shorthair, Sammy Charley, Melvin Curley, Dorothy Todechine, Lucy B Mitchell, Riley Garnanez, Darren Kee, Bessie Duncan, Taylor Black, Raymond Oldman, Lahoma Cly, Martha Curtis, Irvin Yazzie, Esther Mark, Jimmy Nakai, Nina Benally, Helen Howard, Harry Benally, Robin Hayes, Paul Barber, Perry Hayes, Helen Tom, Mae Martin, Christina Silentman, Wanda Benally, Bessie Tesswood, Wallace McGilbert, Rose Benally, Della Weston, Lorraine Black, Shalina Grandson, Marilyn Silas, Vincent Todechene, Max Kellywood, Ella Silas, Lita Joe, Jerome Smith, Jessie Johnson, Carol Anagal, Marlena King, Alice D Yazzie, Julie Harrison, Hilda Baldwin, Wilford Atson, Lewis Todacheene, Wallace Hayes, James Grant, Don Curley, Jimmie Coolidge, Phyllis Valdez, Hubert Harwood, Roger Barber, Judy Begay, Thomas Pete, Jenathan Begaye, Irene Livingston, Larena Benn, Teddy Smallcanyon, Duane Aspaas, Freddie Hobson, Earl D Yazzie, Loren Garnanez, Roselyn Toledo, Calvin Yazzie, Lula Atcitty, Vernida Bissonette, Bernita Begay, Marlene Dobey, James Simpson, John Lansing, Phillip Rentz, Elsie Henry, Susie Dodge, Mary J Phillips, Mable Black, Emerson Hatathley, Thomas T Tyler, Lena Willie, Timothy Ben, Mary Ann Manygoat, Daisy Houser, Arlene Begay, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Charley Jim, Ruth Nez, Ronnie Ross, Ron Miller, Charles D Phillips, Sheila Jim, Shandie Pioche, Virginia Jim, Raymond Jones, Herbert Todacheenie, Roger Sherman, Laverne Nakai, Jacqueline S. Begay, Jay Yazzie, Helen Begay, Anthony Nabahe, Cheryl Armenta, Betty Begay, Betty Jones Nakai, Bessie Shorthair, Margaret Harrison, Andy Begay, Florence B King, Pauline D Nelson, Estate of Leon Jones, Virginia Begay, Loretta Hatathley, Dorothy Phillips, Roger L Simpson, Mae Begay, Kyle Jim, Geneva Jim, Alfred Curley, Francine Kiefert, Cecil Duncan, Raymond Pettigrew, Dina Benally, Anna Vigil, Annie BlueEyes, Etta Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Johnson Washburn Sr., Cynthia Madison, Celeste Silas, Albert Bylilly, Lula Sandoval, Sarah Slowman, Charlene Begay, Annie Henry, Rachel Dee, Jerry Todacheene, Johnson Washburn Jr., Harry S Nakai, Richard Begaye, Byron Nelson, Herman Hunt, Benjamin Clark, Cornelia Weston, Eva Tso, Renita T Jones, Gene Fred, Esther Reddoor, Eric Begay, Aaron Barber, Nelson Rockwell, Wilbert Cowboy, Mary Tso, Shawna Hamm, Sarah A Tony Benally, Marie Lee, Steve Benally, Jonah Jim, Louise Henderson, Lucy Rentz, Dora Todacheene, Mary Enoah, Tonita Nelson, Jonah Begay, Toni Claw, Andrew Brewster, Elton Dodge, Pearlene Benally, Terri Lameman-Austin, Sarah Police, Bertha A Etsitty, Leontyne Atcitty, Susan Benally, Frank John, Vernese Esplain, Gloria Lane, Tom Blackhorse, Michelle A Lee, Carmelita Lowe, Charles Phillips, Eddie Jay, Susie Yazzie, Robert Hayes, Norman Jim, Joanne Holliday, Marylita Begay, Bobby Sandoval, Roselyn Watchman, Roselyn Lee, Allen E Etsitty, Wayne Begay, Ernest Benally, Roy Begay, Crystal Grey, David Ben, Thurston Eddie, Priscilla Bigman, Kee Dan, Larry B Sam, Rowena Littlehat, Clarence D Weston, Corlivia Begaye, Bernadine Todechene, Ella Redhouse, Wilson Phillips, Ada Lansing, James Mason, Daniel Jim, Herbert Willie, Rose Ann Tanner, Wesley Jones, Darrell Clah, Rechelleda Benallie, Lenora Williams, Charlie Todachinnie, Garry Jay, Sylvia Mitchell, Davidson Devore, Marilyn Mustache, Michael N Little, Herman John, Annie Oldman, Caroline Begay, Robert Bekise, Ivan Tyler, Elizabeth Begay, Perfina Rockwell, Harrison Cattleman, Flora Todechine, Irene Todacheenie, Lynalla Benn, John Tso, Max Benally and Joe C. Allen, Jr.
Defendant: Weston Solutions, Inc., Kinross Gold USA, Inc, Gold King Mines Corporation, Kinross Gold Corporation, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Sunnyside Gold Corporation and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00708
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joe C Allen, Joanna McDaniel, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew K. Walsh and exhibits 1-4)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Walsh, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment McDaniel Plaintiffs' Joinder in Sovereign Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joanna McDaniel. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Vega, Adrian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Amendment to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Trial Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Amending Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Discovery by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Resulting from September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 First Amended Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Special Master Hon. Alana C. Torgerson Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Amended Agenda for September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for September 27, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of Utah, Joanna McDaniel, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, Joe C Allen by Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion to Trifurcate Discovery by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson granting in part and denying in part (404) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting in part and denying in part (228) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting in part and denying in part (217) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY; granting in part and denying in part (271) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ; granting in part and denying in part (291) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-cv-00319-WJ; granting in part and denying in part (113) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK; granting in part and denying in part (8) Motion to trifurcate discovery and trial in case 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT and Provisional Discovery Plan and Setting Case Management Deadlines by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Regarding Upcoming Discovery Deadlines, Requirements of Meet and Confer Conferences and Extension of Time to Respond to Federal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Environmental Restoration, LLC of Completion of Briefing re Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re (254 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Complaint Allen Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Joe C. Allen, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Johnson on behalf of Navajo Nation Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Johnson, Lauren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Alan C. Torgerson of Agenda for August 31, 2019 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico re (8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of Utah, Joanna McDaniel, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, Joe C Allen. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (meq).
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR** RESPONSE in Support re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Homer, Andrew) Modified on 8/27/2019 Atty will refile and spread to all applicable cases (meq).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Questionnaires by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Joanna McDaniel Notice of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Vega, Adrian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Joe C Allen of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Ferlic, Katherine)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re (8 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 404 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 113 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 217 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 291 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 228 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Greenberg, Alan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Environmental Restoration, LLC's REPLY in Support of Petition for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal re (105 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 260 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Response, filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re (243 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AGAINST ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial by Joe C Allen, Joanna McDaniel, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Rowenko, Lana)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Navajo Nation of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Walsh, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTS TO JOINT STATUS REPORT by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson for (244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Joint Status Report (JSR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Resulting from August 5, 2019 Initial Scheduling Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re (97 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 212 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 383 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 279 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 206 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Joint Status Report (JSR) Supplement by Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry)
August 6, 2019 Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk assign Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the presiding judge; and associate as a member case with the lead case in the multidistrict litigation case No. 1:18-md-2824-WJ. (mag)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joe C Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jacqueline S. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Corlivia Begaye, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Timothy Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Estate of Leon Jones, Estate of Rose Merritt, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Allen E Etsitty, Bertha A Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Riley Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sheila Jim, Virginia Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Herman John, Anne Johnson, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Jean Jones, Lena J Jones, Raymond Jones, Renita T Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Francine Kiefert, Florence B King, Marlena King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M Lee, Leonard Lee, Marie Lee, Michelle A Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T Merritt, Sherrell G Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M Mitchell, Lucy B Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marilyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Laverne Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Thomas Pete, Ramona Pettigrew, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B Sam, Lula Sandoval, Bobby Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, David Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L Simpson, George L Sisco, Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Gary Smith, Jerome Smith, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todacheene, Lewis Todacheene, Herbert Todacheenie, Irene Todacheenie, Charlie Todachinnie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A Tony Benally, Eva Tso, John Tso, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn Jr., Johnson Washburn Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G Willie, Esther A Yanito, Alice D Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie, Susie Yazzie (Griffing, Katharine)
August 2, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6582869 re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Irita James, Bessie Tesswood, Ernest Benally, Perry Hayes, Marlene Dobey, Freddie Hobson, Rowena Littlehat, Lucy Dick, Norman Jim, Wilbert Cowboy, Jean Jones, Raymond G Willie, Leonard Lee, Susie Yazzie, Lorraine Black, Dorothy Phillips, Carol Anagal, Alfred Curley, Harrison Cattleman, Virginia Jim, Emerson Lee, David Shorthair, Darrell Jim, Roselyn Watchman, Lucy Rentz, Mary J Phillips, Timothy Ben, Wallace Hayes, Melvin Curley, Lula Sandoval, Mary Ann Manygoat, Sherrell G Mesa, Ronnie Ross, Raymond G Sells, Loretta Hatathley, Larry B Sam, Julie Harrison, Roselyn Toledo, Laura M Mitchell, Andy Begay, Harry Lane, Benjamin Clark, Kee Dan, Robert Bekise, Teddy Smallcanyon, Renita T Jones, Raymond Pettigrew, Harry Benally, Perfina Rockwell, Mary Jay, Charles Phillips, Marylita Begay, Lula Atcitty, Anne Johnson, George L Sisco, Tonita Nelson, Margaret Harrison, Irvin Yazzie, Jeannie Benally, Lewis Todacheene, Marlena King, Aaron Barber, Esther Mark, Bernadine Todechene, Michelle A Lee, Davidson Devore, Joanne Holliday, Sammy Charley, Bernita Begay, Roy Begay, Cynthia Madison, Etta Begaye, Charley Jim, Eric Smallcanyon, Mae Martin, Terri Lameman-Austin, Dorothy Todechine, Pearlene Benally, Sarah Slowman, Jenathan Begaye, Shalina Grandson, Bobby Sandoval, Martha Curtis, Lena Willie, Bessie S Pelt, Bessie Duncan, Lahoma Cly, Sarah A Tony Benally, Ramona Pettigrew, Roger L Simpson, Della Weston, Wayne Begay, Christina Silentman, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Estate of Leon Jones, Fannie Marie Jim, Florence B King, Priscilla Bigman, Marilyn Silas, Elsie Joe, Helen Tom, Tommy Draper, Annie Henry, Thomas T Tyler, Juanita Kee, Harry Peshlakai, Calvin Yazzie, Wilford Atson, Harold Williams, Ron Miller, Gerald Maryboy, Vernon Phillips, Helen Begay, Sarah Frank, Irene Todacheenie, John Lansing, Frank John, Charles D Phillips, Cheryl Armenta, Thurston Eddie, Bertha A Etsitty, Gloria Lane, Richard Begaye, Dora Todacheene, Jimmie Coolidge, Lynalla Benn, Shawna Hamm, Anthony Nabahe, Helen Howard, Charlene Begay, Sarah Police, Johnson Washburn Sr., Herbert Willie, Rachel Dee, Lenora Williams, Betty Begay, Vincent Todechene, Larena Benn, Joe C Allen, Laurence Bekise, Max Benally, Roger Sherman, Arlene Begay, Cornelia Weston, Betty Jones Nakai, Ella Redhouse, Mae Begay, Wanda Benally, Anita Hayes, Tom Blackhorse, Elizabeth Begay, Ivan Tyler, Laverne Nakai, Cecil Duncan, Wallace McGilbert, Raymond Oldman, Marie Yazzie, Flora Todechine, Ruby B Silas, Corlivia Begaye, Beverly Maxwell, Byron Nelson, Earl D Yazzie, Jonah Begay, Herman Enoah, Shandie Pioche, Jonah Jim, Robert Hayes, Duane Aspaas, David Ben, Thomas Pete, Esther A Yanito, Don Curley, Jerome Smith, Herman John, Wilson Phillips, Celeste Silas, Scott Brady, Elsie Henry, Lena J Jones, Rose Benally, Mary Enoah, Reyvette Grey, Mary Tso, Daisy Barber, Albert H Lee, Max Kellywood, Evelyn M Lee, Rena Fasthorse, Jay Yazzie, Louise Henderson, Bessie Shorthair, Charlie Todachinnie, Vernese Esplain, Wilma Charley, Crystal Grey, Darren Kee, Phillip Rentz, Alice D Yazzie, Stella Cly, Jerry Todacheene, James Mason, Paul Barber, Lucy B Mitchell, Francine Kiefert, Theron Jones, James Grant, Roger Barber, Mable Black, Doris Coolidge, Raymond Jones, John Tso, Alice Begay, Wesley Jones, Emma Mitchell, Emerson Hatathley, Geneva Jim, Annie Oldman, Ruby Nelson, Gene Fred, Jimmy Nakai, Steve Benally, Tom Horse, Susan Benally, Anna Vigil, Estate of Rose Merritt, Roselyn Lee, Jessie Johnson, Annie BlueEyes, Irene Livingston, Marie Lee, Andrew Brewster, Taylor Black, Herbert Todacheenie, Sheila Jim, Ada Lansing, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Eddie Jay, Harry S Nakai, Rose Ann Tanner, Robin Hayes, Judy Begay, Pauline D Nelson, Harrison Johnson, Jacqueline S. Begay, Lita Joe, Michael N Little, Susie Scott, Daisy Houser, Wade Shorthair, Nina Benally, Gary Smith, Hubert Harwood, Eva Tso, Carmelita Lowe, Esther Reddoor, Albert Bylilly, Sylvia Mitchell, Hilda Baldwin, Herman Hunt, Lorenzo Yazzie, Darlene Bronston, Sandra Begay, Darrell Clah, Roger Shaggy, Nelson Rockwell, Garry Jay, Loren Garnanez, Johnson Washburn Jr., Kyle Jim, Leontyne Atcitty, Rosina T Merritt, Clarence D Weston, Ruth Nez, Elton Dodge, Vernida Bissonette, Jacqueline L. Begay, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Marilyn Mustache, Allen E Etsitty, Cecilia Wallace, Huron Etsitty, James Simpson, Virginia Begay, Ella Silas, Dina Benally, Rechelleda Benallie, Susie Dodge, Daniel Jim, Caroline Begay, Riley Garnanez, Shirley Bia, Janice Frank, Janice Terri Brown, Eric Begay, Phyllis Valdez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Griffing, Katharine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Joe C Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jacqueline S. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Corlivia Begaye, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Timothy Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Estate of Leon Jones, Estate of Rose Merritt, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Allen E Etsitty, Bertha A Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Riley Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sheila Jim, Virginia Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Herman John, Anne Johnson, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Jean Jones, Lena J Jones, Raymond Jones, Renita T Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Francine Kiefert, Florence B King, Marlena King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M Lee, Leonard Lee, Marie Lee, Michelle A Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T Merritt, Sherrell G Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M Mitchell, Lucy B Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marilyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Laverne Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Thomas Pete, Ramona Pettigrew, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B Sam, Lula Sandoval, Bobby Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, David Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L Simpson, George L Sisco, Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Gary Smith, Jerome Smith, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todacheene, Lewis Todacheene, Herbert Todacheenie, Irene Todacheenie, Charlie Todachinnie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A Tony Benally, Eva Tso, John Tso, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn Jr., Johnson Washburn Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G Willie, Esther A Yanito, Alice D Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie, Susie Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffing, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Weston Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Marie Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Wayne Saltwater
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosina T Merritt
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby B Silas
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Smith
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Sisco
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Hayes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Kee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena J Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Wallace
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Shorthair
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Scott
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Shaggy
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Mitchell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn M Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Rose Merritt
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe C Allen
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Clark
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huron Etsitty
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyvette Grey
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Horse
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Nelson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Coolidge
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Barber
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Dick
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Maryboy
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Williams
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Bia
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Frank
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Charley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie S Pelt
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Terri Brown
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G Sells
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L. Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Maxwell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Brady
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrell G Mesa
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert H Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Lane
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Mitchell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smallcanyon
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Johnson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther A Yanito
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irita James
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Joe
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Frank
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Peshlakai
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Fasthorse
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G Willie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Bronston
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Pettigrew
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Enoah
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Cly
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Draper
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shorthair
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Charley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Curley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Todechine
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy B Mitchell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Garnanez
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Kee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Duncan
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Black
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Oldman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lahoma Cly
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Curtis
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Mark
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Nakai
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Howard
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hayes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barber
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Hayes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Tom
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Martin
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Silentman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Tesswood
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace McGilbert
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Weston
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Black
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalina Grandson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Silas
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Todechene
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Kellywood
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Silas
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lita Joe
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Smith
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Johnson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Anagal
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena King
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice D Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Harrison
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Baldwin
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Atson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Todacheene
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Hayes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grant
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Curley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Coolidge
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Valdez
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Harwood
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Barber
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pete
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenathan Begaye
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Livingston
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larena Benn
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Smallcanyon
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Aspaas
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Hobson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl D Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Garnanez
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselyn Toledo
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Atcitty
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernida Bissonette
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernita Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Dobey
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simpson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lansing
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Rentz
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Henry
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Dodge
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary J Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mable Black
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Hatathley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas T Tyler
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Willie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ben
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Manygoat
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Houser
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Bunny, Jr
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charley Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Nez
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ross
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Miller
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandie Pioche
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Todacheenie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sherman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Nakai
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline S. Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nabahe
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Armenta
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jones Nakai
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Shorthair
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Harrison
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence B King
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline D Nelson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Leon Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Hatathley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L Simpson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Curley
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Kiefert
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Duncan
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Pettigrew
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Vigil
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie BlueEyes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Begaye
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Bekise
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Washburn Sr.
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Madison
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Silas
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bylilly
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Sandoval
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Slowman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Henry
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Dee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Todacheene
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Washburn Jr.
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry S Nakai
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Begaye
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Nelson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Hunt
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Clark
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelia Weston
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Tso
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renita T Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Fred
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Reddoor
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Barber
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Rockwell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Cowboy
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tso
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Hamm
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah A Tony Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Henderson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Rentz
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Todacheene
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Enoah
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonita Nelson
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Claw
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brewster
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elton Dodge
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlene Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lameman-Austin
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Police
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha A Etsitty
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leontyne Atcitty
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank John
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernese Esplain
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lane
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Blackhorse
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita Lowe
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Jay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Yazzie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hayes
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Holliday
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylita Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Sandoval
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselyn Watchman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roselyn Lee
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen E Etsitty
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Grey
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ben
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurston Eddie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Bigman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kee Dan
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry B Sam
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena Littlehat
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence D Weston
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corlivia Begaye
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Todechene
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Redhouse
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Phillips
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Lansing
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mason
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jim
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Willie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Tanner
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Jones
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Clah
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rechelleda Benallie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Williams
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Todachinnie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Jay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Mitchell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davidson Devore
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Mustache
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael N Little
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman John
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Oldman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bekise
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Tyler
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Begay
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfina Rockwell
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Cattleman
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Todechine
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Todacheenie
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynalla Benn
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tso
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Benally
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe C. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Katharine Frances Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold King Mines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Restoration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?