Ingwaldson v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Greg Ingwaldson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Richard Moore State Farm Insurance Company and Richard Moore
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Setting Telephone Status Conference. Telephone Status Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes and Setting Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/14/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 1/30/2020; Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 2/28/2020; Discovery Motions due by 05/04/2020; Pretrial Motions due by 5/14/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2020; Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. (kc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2019. (kc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Ingwaldson Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Gilpin, Donald)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Piazza, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Piazza, Elizabeth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Uninsured Motorist Benefits, Declaratory Judgment, Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Insurance Bad Faith, Violations of the New Mexico Insurance Code, and Violations of New Mexico Unfair Claims Practices Act by Richard Moore, Richard Moore State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/25/2019. (kc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 3, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
August 30, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6643475 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from New Mexico Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-05694. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Terry Guebert)(Piazza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingwaldson v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Moore State Farm Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Ingwaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?