Gallegos v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00819
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Vina Johnson on behalf of Social Security Administration (Johnson, Victoria)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos. Attorney General served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Martone, Feliz) Modified on 10/18/2019 (aek).
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos. US Attorney's Office served on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Martone, Feliz) Modified on docket text 10/18/2019 (aek).
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos. Social Security Administration served on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Martone, Feliz)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martone, Feliz)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
September 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
September 6, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6654503 re #1 Complaint filed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martone, Feliz)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Feliz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian Laura Pettine Gallegos
Represented By: Feliz MariSol Martone
Represented By: Gary J Martone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?