Savich v. Liberty Mutual Insurance et al.
Plaintiff: Luka Savich
Defendant: Safeco Insurance and Liberty Mutual Insurance and
Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luka Savich Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendants (Houliston, David)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Settlement Conference for 02/05/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 04/27/2020. Discovery Motions due by 05/19/2020. Pretrial Motions due by 05/28/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 09/11/2020. (cm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2019. (cm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING the telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 9:30 AM and RESCHEDULING it for 10/29/2019 at 8:30 AM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Liberty Mutual Insurance (Allen, Meena)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Initial Disclosures (Allen, Meena)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luka Savich Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Houliston, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 09:30 AM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/02/2019. (cm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance (Allen, Meena)
September 10, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6660447 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Safeco Insurance (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, case number D-202-CV-2019-01901. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savich v. Liberty Mutual Insurance et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance and
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luka Savich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?