Luna v. Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Plaintiff: Yessika Luna and Yessika Ayala Luna
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Case Number: 1:2019cv00832
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgement of receipt of complete case file 10/4/19 by Clerk of Second Judicial District Court. (bap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 Letter by Clerk of U.S. District Court, District of New Mexico to Clerk of Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County re Remand back to State Court (bap)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting #9 MOTION to Remand to Second Judicial District Court. (bap)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona. (O'Brien, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING RULE 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the potentially dispositive #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Yessika Ayala Luna. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Yessika Ayala Luna. (Ayala, Anthony)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia M. Santos on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona (Santos, Alicia)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 10/15/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/1/2019. (ccp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
September 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (aek)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 (CORRECTED) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-04933. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (O'Brien, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2019 (aek).
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona for Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona. (O'Brien, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J O'Brien on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona (O'Brien, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6660240 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yessika Luna, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona (Payment made via Pay.gov)(O'Brien, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yessika Luna, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-04933. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Yessika Luna, Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(O'Brien, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2019 (aek).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Represented By: Alicia M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessika Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessika Ayala Luna
Represented By: Anthony James Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?