Tissera v. Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Plaintiff: Nilusha Joseph Tissera
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Case Number: 1:2019cv00837
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Nilusha Joseph Tissera (Fadner, Derek)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Keller, Courtenay)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for November 12, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by November 5, 2019. (plp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Dismiss Count IV for Negligence of Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona (Keller, Courtenay)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona. (Keller, Courtenay)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Nilusha Joseph Tissera Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of Nilusha Joseph Tissera (Fadner, Derek)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
September 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (aek)
September 10, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6662138 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keller, Courtenay)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona from 2nd Judicial District, Bernalillo County, NM, case number D-202-CV-2019-05772. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Summons, #2 Exhibit Service letter, #3 Exhibit Proof of service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Courtenay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tissera v. Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilusha Joseph Tissera
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company of Arizona
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Justin R Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?