Victory Outreach Albuquerque v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Victory Outreach Albuquerque
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00850
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 10:30 AM and RESCHEDULING Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. (kfg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Church Mutual Insurance Company re Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Vigil, Charles)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Victory Outreach Albuquerque of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant (Fadner, Derek)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Church Mutual Insurance Company (Vigil, Charles)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/11/2019. (kfg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Vigil, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Victory Outreach Albuquerque Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of Victory Outreach Albuquerque (Fadner, Derek)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
September 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (aek)
September 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6669902 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vigil, Charles)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2019-06034. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vigil, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Outreach Albuquerque v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Outreach Albuquerque
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?