Castillo v. Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Castillo
Defendant: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 1/30/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 1/14/2020. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 1/24/2020. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 1/28/2020. (kys)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic InitialScheduling Conference held on 11/1/2019. (kys)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 7 and 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Status Report by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company (Biehler, Gregory)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. (Biehler, Gregory)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by John Castillo Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of John Castillo (Fadner, Derek)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/28/2019. (kys)
September 17, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6677030 re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company from 13th Judicial District Court Sandoval County, case number D-1329-CV-2019-01681. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Biehler, Gregory)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR-EXHIBITS NOT ATTACHED*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company from 13th Judicial District Court Sandoval County, case number D-1329-CV-2019-01681. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biehler, Gregory) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Castillo
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?