State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Mayflower Transit, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: John Doe
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Mayflower Transit, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Jeffrey Nekola
Case Number: 1:2019cv00966
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayflower Transit, LLC. Jeffrey Nekola served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Henry, Vic)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Barnes, Julia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Strike Unallowable Portions of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment and Notice of Intent to Accept Revised Paragraph 3 of Offer of Judgment by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Barnes, Julia)
November 15, 2019 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Jeffrey Nekola. (ln)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Mayflower Transit, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Nekola by Mayflower Transit, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Henry, Vic)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kys)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mayflower Transit, LLC (Henry, Vic)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Mayflower Transit, LLC. (Henry, Vic)
October 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mayflower Transit, LLC. (dr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 15, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
October 15, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6735210 re #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Barnes, Julia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Subrogation Property Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Mayflower Transit, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Julia Hosford Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Mayflower Transit, LLC
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeffrey Nekola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?