Medline Industries, Inc. v. Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC, WW Healthcare, LLC and Rehab Suites at Las Estancias, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00971
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Basile, Valentina)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medline Industries, Inc.. Rehab Suites at Las Estancias, LLC served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Kienzle, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medline Industries, Inc.. WW Healthcare, LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Kienzle, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medline Industries, Inc.. Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Kienzle, Paul)
November 30, 2019 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action Rehab Suites at Las Estancias, LLC, served on Robert G. Ptacek on 10/30/2019, filed by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kienzle, Paul) Modified on 12/2/2019 (dr).
November 30, 2019 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action WW Healthcare, LLC, served on Travis Matthew on 10/29/2019, filed by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kienzle, Paul) Modified on 12/2/2019 (dr).
November 30, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action for Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC, served on Robert G. Ptacek on 10/30/2019, filed by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kienzle, Paul) Modified on 12/2/2019 (dr).
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC, Rehab Suites at Las Estancias, LLC, WW Healthcare, LLC. (dr)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET by Medline Industries, Inc. (Kienzle, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 15, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
October 15, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6736819 re #1 Complaint filed by Medline Industries, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kienzle, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONEY OWED against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Kienzle, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medline Industries, Inc. v. Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Kienzle, III
Represented By: Valentina Elizabeth Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiesta Park Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehab Suites at Las Estancias, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?