National Indemnity Company v. TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Indemnity Company
Defendant: Raymond Valdez, TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc., Eric Rivera, Tracy Thomas, Rivera's Recovery, LLC, Elijah Fernandez-Gurule, Jaylyn Valdez and James Valdez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00977
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Bobby R Baldock
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON THIRD MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendant Rivera's Motion to Extend (Doc. 19) is granted. The deadlines for Defendants Rivera and Rivera's Recovery, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint are extended to 12/31/2019. (kmt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend by Eric Rivera. (jjs)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendant Rivera's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. 17) is denied without prejudice. Defendant Rivera may file a third motion seeking an extension of time in which to answer Plaintiff's complaint that complies with this Order by 12/6/2019. Defendant Rivera's Recovery, LLC may file a second motion seeking an extension of time in which to answer Plaintiff's complaint that complies with this Order by 12/6/2019. The deadline for Defendants Rivera and Rivera's Recovery, LLC to answer Plaintiff's complaint is extended sua sponte to 12/6/2019. (kmt)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eric Rivera, Rivera's Recovery, LLC. (bap)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendant Rivera's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 15) is denied without prejudice. Defendant Rivera may file another motion seeking an extension of time in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint that complies with this Order on or before 11/25/2019. The deadline for Defendant Rivera to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended sua sponte to 11/25/2019. (kmt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time by Eric Rivera. (bap)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company. Rivera's Recovery, LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Noya, Jennifer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company. Eric Rivera served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Noya, Jennifer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Elijah Fernandez-Gurele, Tracy Thomas by James Valdez, Jaylyn Valdez, Raymond Valdez. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by National Indemnity Company.(Rosenstock, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Eric Rivera, and Rivera's Recovery, LLC. (aek)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Thomas as to Tracy Thomas. (Rosenstock, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Valdez, Jaylyn Valdez, Raymond Valdez as to James Valdez, Jaylyn Valdez, Raymond Valdez, Elijah Fernandez-Gurule. (Rosenstock, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. as to TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Circuit Judge Bobby R Baldock as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. as to TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Justin) Modified on docket text 10/17/2019 (aek).
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 16, 2019 Unites States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
October 16, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6740519 re #1 Complaint filed by National Indemnity Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Noya, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Indemnity Company v. TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Valdez
Represented By: Richard Rosenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Thomas
Represented By: Richard Rosenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera's Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Fernandez-Gurule
Represented By: Richard Rosenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaylyn Valdez
Represented By: Richard Rosenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Valdez
Represented By: Richard Rosenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?