Miles, et al. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Gloria Tsosie and Valerie Miles
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00993
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant United States' deadline to Answer is extended to 01/22/2020. (cm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Ortega, Roberto)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto D Ortega on behalf of United States of America (Ortega, Roberto)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Miles. United States Attorney served on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Itoh, Charlotte)
October 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (aek)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 23, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (aek)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Valerie Miles Civil Cover Sheet (Itoh, Charlotte)
October 23, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6754319 re #1 Complaint filed by Valerie Miles (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Itoh, Charlotte)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Medical Malpractice and Damages against United States of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Valerie Miles. (Itoh, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles, et al. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Tsosie
Represented By: Charlotte Itoh
Represented By: Joseph M. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Miles
Represented By: Joseph M. Fine
Represented By: Charlotte Itoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Roberto D Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?