Mejia v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: JONATHAN MEJIA
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01008
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Piazza, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Mejia First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant (Szantho, Andras)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 5/8/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Motions due by 8/3/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2020. (cda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019 before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Mejia Initial Disclosures (Szantho, Andras)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Piazza, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Piazza on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Piazza, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) First Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Scheduling Conferece set for 12/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 12/2/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/20/2019. (ccp)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
October 29, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (aek)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 "FILED IN ERROR" Duplicate entry. Filing fee paid online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6764883 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 10/29/2019 (bap).
October 28, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6764883 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-10-CV-2019-02422. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C. AFFIDAVIT TRG, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piazza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN MEJIA
Represented By: Andras Szantho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?