Lucero v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Joe H Lucero, Jr. and Joe H Lucero
Defendant: H.S.B.C Bank U.S.A.N.A. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01110
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting #5 Motion to Dismiss Case without prejudice (bap)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Discovery filed by Joe H Lucero. (bap)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. re #7 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Curran, Charles)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Discovery filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Curran, Charles)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Curran, Charles)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery by Joe H Lucero. (nr)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion (Doc. 5) and the pending Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 7). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.]ORDER re #5 (ccp)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Curran, Charles)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: In light of the pending #5 Motion to Dismiss, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by December 30, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](gbg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Curran, Charles)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. re 3 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only),,, (Curran, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 2, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. [DEFENDANT'S DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] (Curran, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6825331 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Curran, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. from Second Judicial District of Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-201908990. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curran, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.S.B.C Bank U.S.A.N.A.
Represented By: Charles R Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Charles R Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe H Lucero, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe H Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?