City of Albuquerque v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Albuquerque
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, CVS Health, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Andrei Marchenko, CNP, Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co., Marchell Woodruff, PA, Peter Pacheco, PA, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Laura LeBlanc, NP, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rebecca Duchon, PA, Bitu Sheth, PA, SPECGX LLC, Michael L Gallegos, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Marchell Woodruff, Peter Pacheco, John and Jane Does, Laura LeBlanc, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Andrei Marchenko, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Rebecca Duchon and Bitu Sheth
Case Number: 1:2019cv01168
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement by City of Albuquerque. (Salazar, Pia)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2020 re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Albuquerque, #16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11] filed by City of Albuquerque. (Court Reporter J Bean) (vv)
January 21, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Baker, Douglas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Pound, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement by Laura LeBlanc. (Biehler, Gregory)
January 21, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6909761 re: # 33 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pound, John)
January 17, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11], #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Counsel may appear by telephone by first notifying the Court of their telephonic appearance and then dialing the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852; access code: 5469085#. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11], #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11] filed by City of Albuquerque. (Salazar, Pia)
January 14, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Salazar, Pia)
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Biehler on behalf of Laura LeBlanc (Biehler, Gregory)
January 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. Of Filing State Court File Pursuant To Local Rule 81.1(A) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pound, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Allison, Benjamin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Gerald Grafe, III on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Grafe, Victor)
December 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pound, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Pound, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11] filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pound, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Michael L Gallegos of Unopposed Extension of Time for Defendant Michael L. Gallegos to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Hale, Jesse)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse D. Hale on behalf of Michael L Gallegos (Hale, Jesse)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.'s Answer now due on or before 2/10/2020. (mlt)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 11] by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Salazar, Pia)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Eric Jackson on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Baker, Mark)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T Baker on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Baker, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Albuquerque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Salazar, Pia)
December 16, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6857454 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Albuquerque (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McCarley, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Albuquerque by Pia D. Salazar on behalf of: S. Ann Saucer Fears Nachawati, PLLC 5473 Blair RoadDallas, TX 75231 (214) 890-0711 Fax (214) 890-0712 asaucer@fnlawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Salazar, Pia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6855134 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Albuquerque (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McCarley, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6855100 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Albuquerque (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McCarley, Matthew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Albuquerque by Pia D. Salazar on behalf of: Jonathon P. Novak Fears Nachawati, PLLC 5473 Blair RoadDallas, TX 75231 (214) 890-0711 Fax (214) 890-0712 jnovak@fnlawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Salazar, Pia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Albuquerque by Pia D. Salazar on behalf of: Matthew R. McCarley Fears Nachawati, PLLC 5473 Blair RoadDallas, TX 75231 (214) 890-0711 Fax (214) 890-0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Salazar, Pia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Max A Jones on behalf of Rebecca Duchon, Peter Pacheco, Bitu Sheth, Marchell Woodruff (Jones, Max)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 12, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
December 11, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6849520 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pound, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Pound, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County, New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2019-05386. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - (State Court Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pound, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Albuquerque v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Larry D Maldegen
Represented By: Michael J Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Marchenko, CNP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance d/b/a Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marchell Woodruff, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pacheco, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John B Pound
Represented By: Eliseo R Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura LeBlanc, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John B Pound
Represented By: Eliseo R Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey B Fruman
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Duchon, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitu Sheth, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Gallegos
Represented By: Stefan R. Chacon
Represented By: Jesse D. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marchell Woodruff
Represented By: Max A Jones
Represented By: Thomas R Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pacheco
Represented By: Max A Jones
Represented By: Thomas R Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura LeBlanc
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Eric Jackson
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Marchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Duchon
Represented By: Max A Jones
Represented By: Thomas R Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitu Sheth
Represented By: Max A Jones
Represented By: Thomas R Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Novak
Represented By: Matthew R McCarley
Represented By: Sherri Ann Saucer
Represented By: Patrick W. Sullivan
Represented By: Pia D. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?