Romero v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Colton Romero
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Carol Bruno
Case Number: 1:2019cv01179
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 2/18/2020. (mag)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ketai, David)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 2/12/2020. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ketai, David)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter finding good cause, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), and hereby VACATES the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for February 18, 2020 and all associated deadlines at this time due to the pending motion to remand.(plp) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Colton Romero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Vargas, Ray)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for February 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by February 11, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than January 28, 2020. (plp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant State Farm's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ketai, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
December 16, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6857306 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carol Bruno, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Piazza, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carol Bruno, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from New Mexico Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-07772. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Carol Bruno, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Piazza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bruno
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: David Ketai
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Romero
Represented By: Ray M Vargas, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?