Wantuck et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hope Wantuck and Brian Wantuck
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01186
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Wantuck, Hope Wantuck Plaintiffs' Rule 26(A) Disclosures (Sapien, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant's Rule 26(A) Disclosures (Stiff, John)
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 07/26/2021, through 07/30/2021, (approximately five (5) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 06/25/2021, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 05/21/2021, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/5/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery is due by 8/25/2020. Motions are due by 9/24/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 11/23/2020. (ag)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/2020. (ag)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Joint Status Report is due by 1/21/2020. A Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1/28/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/10/2020. (ag)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
December 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6861691 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stiff, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-03196. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stiff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wantuck et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Wantuck
Represented By: Joseph A Sapien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wantuck
Represented By: Joseph A Sapien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John S. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?