Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital v. Azar
Plaintiff: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 1:2019cv01194
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Lauren) Modified on 2/12/2020 (dr).
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Lauren) Modified on 2/12/2020 (dr).
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Lauren) Modified on 2/12/2020 (dr).
January 16, 2020 Summons Reissued as to US Attorney. (aek)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital (Rodriguez, Lauren)
December 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (aek)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 20, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of REHOBOTH MCKINLEY CHRISTIAN HEALTH CARE SERVICES HOSPITAL (Smith, Nolan)
December 20, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6866836 re #1 Complaint filed by REHOBOTH MCKINLEY CHRISTIAN HEALTH CARE SERVICES HOSPITAL (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rodriguez, Lauren)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Rodriguez on behalf of REHOBOTH MCKINLEY CHRISTIAN HEALTH CARE SERVICES HOSPITAL (Rodriguez, Lauren)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by REHOBOTH MCKINLEY CHRISTIAN HEALTH CARE SERVICES HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services Hospital
Represented By: Lauren Rodriguez
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?