Grass v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Grass
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00065
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION FOR STAY OF ANY ACTION by James Grass. (cer)
March 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration (U.S. Attorney General, Civil Processing Clerk Region VIII, Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney Office). (cer)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sls)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 22, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form receive notification via U.S. postal mail by James Grass. (arp)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Grass. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grass v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?