Coffin et al v. Magellan HRSC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christie Coffin, Kimberly Willmott and Brenda Kasaty
Defendant: Magellan HRSC, Inc. and FNU Does
Case Number: 1:2020cv00144
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
3 Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SECOND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Class certification discovery due 12/5/2022. Class certification motions due 12/30/2022. (gbg)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Scheduling Order Deadlines by Christie Coffin. (Ostroff, Sheldon)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/5/2022. Motions due by 10/31/2022. (arp)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Class certification discovery due 10/5/2022. Class certification motions due 10/31/2022. The 9/16/2022 class certification hearing is vacated and will be rescheduled by the presiding judge at a later date. (gbg)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Initial Scheduling Order Deadlines by Christie Coffin, Brenda Kasaty, Kimberly Willmott. (Ostroff, Sheldon)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge James O. Browning no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ng)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #75 Amended Complaint, by Magellan HRSC, Inc..(Shadi, Sabrina)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violations of California Labor Law Statutes, Unfair Business Practices and California Private Attorneys General Act, California Labor Code Sections 2698, et seq. against All Defendants., filed by Christie Coffin, Kimberly Willmott, Brenda Kasaty. (Ostroff, Sheldon)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #73 Joint Motion for Leave to File to File First Amended Complaint (bap)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Christie Coffin, Brenda Kasaty, Kimberly Willmott. (Shinoff, Daniel)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN #69 filed by Magellan HRSC, Inc., MAGELLAN HRSC, INC. (bap)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning; Class Certification Discovery due by 7/7/2022. Class Certification Motions due by 8/1/2022. Class Certification Hearing set for 9/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2021. (Court Reporter J. Bean) (bap)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Shadi, Sabrina)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER, pursuant to the direction of District Judge James O. Browning, vacating the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/13/2021 as a result of a jury trial resuming before Judge Browning. The Scheduling Conference shall be reset for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (lr) THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Christie Coffin Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Jahnke, Abbey)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning; Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 11:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #48 MOTION to Change Venue by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying #48 Motion to Change Venue (vv)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark R Phillips; Mona Razani; Mara D. Curtis and Heather Marie Martone terminated (meq)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW REED SMITH LLP AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT MAGELLAN HRSC, INC. by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Razani, Mona)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by Christie Coffin Notice of Unavailability from October 5, 2020, through October 23, 2020 (Jahnke, Abbey) Modified on 9/24/2020 to reflect dates of unavailability(cmm).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2020 re #48 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Christie Coffin. (Court Reporter S Hilton) (vv)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #48 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom - Remote before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via AT&T Telephone Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING, PARTIES SHOULD DIAL 1-888-684-8852; ACCESS CODE 5469085.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Christie Coffin. (Jahnke, Abbey)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #48 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Counsel wishing to appear remotely should contact the courtroom deputy at 505-348-2289 at least 72 hours in advance to advise how they wish to appear for the hearing and advise the courtroom deputy of other parties to be included in the hearing, either remotely or in person. Should the CRD not receive contact from the party, the Court will presume the party wishes to appear in person. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Temple, Mark)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #48 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically should notify the Courtroom Deputy 24 hours in advance at 505-348-2289 and at the time of hearing call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852; access code 5469085. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003333 re: 53 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc., for Sabrina Shadi. (mjr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified text on 7/9/2020 (mjr).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc. by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of: Sabrina Shadi Baker Hostetler 11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509 310-442-8848 sshadi@bakerlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Bartell, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified text on 7/9/2020 (mjr).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. Certification Pursuant to DNMLR-CIV 83.3 (Bartell, Randy)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #48 MOTION to Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically should notify the Courtroom Deputy 24 hours in advance at 505-348-2289 and at the time of hearing call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852; access code 5469085#. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION re #48 MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Abbey M. Jahnke in Support by Christie Coffin (Jahnke, Abbey)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Christie Coffin. (Jahnke, Abbey)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Change Venue by Christie Coffin. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Errata B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Jahnke, Abbey)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2020. (Court Reporter J Bean) (vv)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Martone, Heather)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. JOINT NOTICE TO THE COURT OF STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE THE JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN (Martone, Heather)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Martone, Heather)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Martone, Heather)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline to File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Christie Coffin. (Jahnke, Abbey)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING #26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER and [ECF 38] RULE 16 HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Court's #26 Initial Scheduling Order, and its associated deadlines and [ECF 38] Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing, are hereby VACATED. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16(C) HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The #26 Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing, originally is set for 4/10/2020, is hereby RESET to 4/9/2020 at 04:00 PM (MDT). The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003295 re: 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc., Defendant MAGELLAN HRSC, INC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO D.N.M. LR-CIV. 83.3 of Mark Tem (Bartell, Randy)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc. by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of: Mark D. Temple Reed Smith LLP 811 Main Street, Suite 1700Houston, TX 77002-6110 713 469 3800 Fax 713 469 3899 mtemple@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Bartell, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Association Dues: $ 300 paid, receipt number # SF003290 re: 30 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc., Defendant MAGELLAN HRSC, INC., 32 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc., Defendant MAGELLAN HRSC, INC., 28 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc., Defendant MAGELLAN HRSC, INC. (mjr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re 32 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-CIV. 83.3 for Mona Razani (Bartell, Randy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc. by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of: Mona A. Razani Reed Smith LLP 355 South Grand Avenue | Suite 2800Los Angeles | CA | 90071 213-457-8188 Fax Los Angeles | CA | 90071 MRazani@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Bartell, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re 30 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-CIV. 83.3 for Mark Phillips (Bartell, Randy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc. by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of: Mark Phillips Reed Smith LLP 355 South Grand Avenue | Suite 2800Los Angeles | CA | 90071 213-457-8184 Fax 213.457.8080 MPhillips@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Bartell, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re 28 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-CIV. 83.3 for Heather Martone (Bartell, Randy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Magellan HRSC, Inc. by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of: Heather Martone Reed Smith LLP 355 South Grand Avenue | Suite 2800Los Angeles | CA | 90071 213.457.8182 Fax 213.457.8080 hmartone@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Bartell, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of All Defendants (Bartell, Randy)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing is set for 4/10/2020 at 01:30 PM (Mountain Time) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/16/2020. (gbg)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01337. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Case transferred to United States District Court for the District of New Mexico. Files transferred electronically to: *District of United States District Court for the District of New Mexico*.*333 Lomas Boulevard, N.W., Suite 270**Albuquerque, NM 87102*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/19/20. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue) (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Reed Phillips on behalf of Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Phillips, Mark)Attorney Mark Reed Phillips added to party Magellan HRSC, Inc. (pty:dft) (sjm). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 19cv1337-BAS-NLS.(no document attached) (mme) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19CV1337-BEN(NLS). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/06/2019.(jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Abbey M. Jahnke on behalf of Christie Coffin (Jahnke, Abbey)Attorney Abbey M. Jahnke added to party Christie Coffin(pty:pla) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER vacating hearing on #11 Motion to stay and taking matter under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/30/2019`.(jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Martone on behalf of Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Martone, Heather)Attorney Heather Marie Martone added to party Magellan HRSC, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Action or, in th Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Curtis, Mara) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Action or, in th Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Christie Coffin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Abbey M. Jahnke)(Jahnke, Abbey) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant's ex parte motion to vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/12/2019. (jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Ex Parte Application to Continue or, in the Alternative Vacate the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Confernece by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration)(Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Action or, in th Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Table of Contents, #6 Exhibit Exh. A - Court Docket, #7 Exhibit Exh. B - First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exh. C. - Court's Memorandum, #9 Exhibit Exh. D. - Consent, #10 Exhibit Exh. E - Consent, #11 Exhibit Exh. F. - Consent, #12 Exhibit Exh. G - Second Amended Complaint)(Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: (1) Granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to appear telephonically for Early Neutral Evaluation Conferenc; (2) Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/08/2019. (jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Telephonically for ENE Conference by Christie Coffin, Brenda Kasaty, Kimberly Willmott re #6 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (Attachments: #1 Declaration MTN to allow Plaintiffs to appear telephonically at ENE, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Ostroff, Sheldon) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re #3 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, (Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court Record by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Mashouf, Fatemeh)Attorney Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf added to party Magellan HRSC, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/20/2019 02:30pm before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/18/2019.(jpp) Modified on 7/19/2019 to edit Judge info. (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magellan HRSC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Magellan HRSC, Inc., Corporate Parent Merit Behavioral Care Corporation, Corporate Parent Magellan Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent Magellan Health, Inc. for Magellan HRSC, Inc... (Curtis, Mara) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Magellan HRSC, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Magellan HRSC, Inc., Corporate Parent Merit Behavioral Care Corporation, Corporate Parent Magellan Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent Magellan Health, Inc. for Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Curtis, Mara) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Magellan HRSC, Inc. of case(s) 1:17-cv-00773-LF-KK . (Curtis, Mara) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00030724-CU-OE-CTL filed by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12733522). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1337-JLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffin et al v. Magellan HRSC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Coffin
Represented By: Abbey M. Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shinoff
Represented By: Abbey Marie Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Willmott
Represented By: Abbey M. Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shinoff
Represented By: Abbey Marie Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kasaty
Represented By: Abbey M. Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shinoff
Represented By: Abbey Marie Jahnke
Represented By: Sheldon A. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan HRSC, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R Phillips
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Represented By: Heather Marie Martone
Represented By: Mara D. Curtis
Represented By: Randy S. Bartell
Represented By: Mona A. Razani
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Represented By: Sabrina L Shadi
Represented By: Mona Razani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?