Murphy v. Navajo Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis P. Murphy
Defendant: Gail Mary Roland, Navajo Express, Inc. and Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00192
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Dennis P. Murphy of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sloan, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc. Certificate of Service - Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Brittain, Eric)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Status Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (ccp)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 12/10/2020. Motions due by 1/20/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2021. (ccp)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2020. (ccp)
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gail Mary Roland First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Ramos, S)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Navajo Express, Inc. Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Ramos, S)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Navajo Express, Inc. (Ramos, S) Modified on 4/8/2020 (yc).
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Navajo Express, Inc. (Ramos, S)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Filing Fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB046274 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc. Amended Notice of Consent to Removal of Action to Federal Court (Brittain, Eric)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc. Notice of Consent to Removal of Action to Federal Court (Brittain, Eric)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Personal Injury and Wrongful Death by Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc.. (Brittain, Eric)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/7/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/26/2020. (ccp)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant Navajo Express, Inc., And Gail Mary Roland's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) For Personal Injury And Wrongful Death by Navajo Express, Inc.. (Ramos, S)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navajo Express, Inc. (Ramos, S)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Navajo Express, Inc. and Gail Mary Roland from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-00374. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Navajo Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramos, S)
March 4, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Navajo Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis P. Murphy
Represented By: Rachael Jones
Represented By: John D Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Mary Roland
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo Express, Inc.
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Food Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?