Montoya v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Annette L. Montoya
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00212
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff paid the filing fee on 4/28/2020. The Order to Cure Deficiency has been satisfied and is hereby quashed. See Docs. 5, 8. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arp)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Cure Defects, filed by Annette L. Montoya. (O'Neal, Katherine)
April 28, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7099932 re #1 Complaint filed by Annette L. Montoya (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnson, Laura)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting plaintiff's request for an extension of time to submit her filing fee or otherwise cure the defects in her application for IFP status. Filing fee or Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), due no later than 5/3/2020. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE with Supporting Memorandum re #5 Order to Cure Defects, filed by Annette L. Montoya. (Johnson, Laura)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Cure Deficiency by 4/1/2020. The CLERK OF COURT shall send plaintiff's counsel a copy of this order and an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form." (ccp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Annette L. Montoya voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Johnson, Laura)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 10, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Annette L. Montoya. (Johnson, Laura)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Annette L. Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette L. Montoya
Represented By: Laura J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?