Hamadi v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mercedes Hamadi
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00220
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Holland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Holland, Laura)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney's Office served on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (jg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020 (jg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (jg)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Mercedes Hamadi. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
March 31, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mercedes Hamadi voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (MacDowell, Francesca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States. (kfo)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 11, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mercedes Hamadi. (MacDowell, Francesca)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Mercedes Hamadi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacDowell, Francesca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamadi v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Hamadi
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Laura Holland
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?