Oliver v. Meow Wolf, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Adele Oliver
Defendant: Meow Wolf, Inc, FNU Does and Vince Kadlubek
Case Number: 1:2020cv00237
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Chan on behalf of Lauren Adele Oliver (Chan, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Lauren Adele Oliver re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification of Good Standing for Andrew J. Chan (Boyd, Jesse)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Lauren Adele Oliver by Jesse A Boyd on behalf of: Andrew J. Chan Ericksen Arbuthnot 2300 Clayton Rd, Ste 350Concord, CA 94520 (510) 832-7770 achan@ericksenarbuthnot.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Boyd, Jesse)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-7048681 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Lauren Adele Oliver (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Boyd, Jesse)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Vince Kadlubek, Meow Wolf, Inc. (arp)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Report re: copyright (arp)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing fee paid online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-7027804 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Lauren Adele Oliver re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet (Ward, Vincent)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Violation and Threatened Violation of the Visual Artists Rights Act, Copyright Infringement, Breach of Contract, Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Unjust Enrichment, Conversion, Misrepresentation, and Constructive Trust against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Lauren Adele Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ward, Vincent)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Meow Wolf, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Adele Oliver
Represented By: Vincent J Ward
Represented By: Jesse A Boyd
Represented By: Andrew Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meow Wolf, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Kadlubek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?