Keller v. Arrieta
Plaintiff: Rachel Kay Keller
Defendant: Andrew F. Arrieta
Case Number: 1:2020cv00259
Filed: March 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Rachel Kay Keller re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #10 Notice of Briefing Complete filed by Rachel Kay Keller (Thomas, Denise)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #10 Notice of Briefing Complete filed by Rachel Kay Keller. (Thomas, Denise)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Rachel Kay Keller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Thomas, Denise)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #10 Notice of Briefing Complete filed by Andrew F. Arrieta. (Bartell, Randy)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #10 Notice of Briefing Complete by Rachel Kay Keller. (Thomas, Denise)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Andrew F. Arrieta re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew F. Arrieta (Bartell, Randy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of 6 Motion to Dismiss. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Kay Keller. Andrew F. Arrieta served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Thomas, Denise)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy S. Bartell on behalf of Andrew F. Arrieta (Bartell, Randy)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Summons served on Andrew Arrieta on 03/31/2020, filed by Rachel Kay Keller. (Thomas, Denise) Modified on 4/14/2020 (arp).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew F. Arrieta ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rachel Kay Keller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Denise)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7039962 re #1 Complaint filed by Rachel Kay Keller (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomas, Denise)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (arp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Andrew F. Arrieta. (arp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Arrieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kay Keller
Represented By: Denise M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew F. Arrieta
Represented By: Randy S. Bartell
Represented By: Matthew A. Zidovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?